This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 03/15/2022 at 18:01:29 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Blase James Popik, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 01/04/2022 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Blase James Popik, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lo, Paul and Ash, Carol. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0032

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lo, Paul

Ash, Carol

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Popik, Blase James

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Egan, Gerad Denis

Margain, Andre Carlos

Defendant Attorneys

Andrade, Vincent

Foster, Douglas

Akbari, Tabasum

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

01/04/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

01/04/2022: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

01/24/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Motion

01/24/2022: Motion

Criminal: Minute Order

01/25/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

02/16/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketPreliminary Examination; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Margain, Andre Carlos; Defendant: Popik, Blase James; Contract Public Defender: Akbari, Tabasum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion; Original Type: Motion; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Margain, Andre Carlos; Defendant: Popik, Blase James; Contract Public Defender: Foster, Douglas

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Margain, Andre Carlos; Defendant: Popik, Blase James

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketRequest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC30605(a): Possess Any Assault Weapon; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 002; PC33215: Manuf. Weapon: short-barreled rifle/shotgun; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 003; HS11370.1(a): Possess Cont. Substance Armed W/ Firearm; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 004; PC29180c: Own firearm without serial number; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Egan, Gerad Denis; Defendant: Popik, Blase James

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Popik, Blase James; Charge #: 004; Description: PC29180c: Own firearm without serial number; Statute: 29180c; Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Popik, Blase James; Charge #: 003; Description: HS11370.1(a): Possess Cont. Substance Armed W/ Firearm; Statute: 11370.1(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Popik, Blase James; Charge #: 002; Description: PC33215: Manuf. Weapon: short-barreled rifle/shotgun; Statute: 33215; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Popik, Blase James; Charge #: 001; Description: PC30605(a): Possess Any Assault Weapon; Statute: 30605(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Akbari, Tabasum

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrade, Vincent

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Foster, Douglas