This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 10/01/2021 at 16:02:42 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Austin Welch, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 09/17/2021 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Austin Welch, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Shaver, Donald, Lo, Paul and Hansen, Ronald. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4525

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Shaver, Donald

Lo, Paul

Hansen, Ronald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Welch, Austin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Serratto, Matthew Travers

Colby, Travis

Compton, Misty

Defendant Attorneys

Reed, Katharine

Andrade, Vincent

Lee, Beth A

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

09/27/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

09/23/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

09/17/2021: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

09/17/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: TBA, Judge; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Welch, Austin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Compton, Misty; Defendant: Welch, Austin; Deputy Public Defender: Lee, Beth A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Defendant: Welch, Austin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Welch, Austin; Charge #: 001; Description: PC242: Battery; Statute: 242; Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Reed, Katharine

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lee, Beth A

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrade, Vincent