This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 08/24/2021 at 18:01:36 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Arturo Chavez, III, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 06/25/2021 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Arturo Chavez, III, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lo, Paul, Hansen, Ronald and McCabe, Brian. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2620

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    New Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lo, Paul

Hansen, Ronald

McCabe, Brian

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Chavez, Arturo Marmolejo, III

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Min, Thomas Keynes

Gates, Kathryn

Defendant Attorneys

Andrade, Vincent

Partin, Lauri L

Lee, Beth A

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order (Amended)

08/23/2021: Criminal: Minute Order (Amended)

Criminal: Minute Order

08/23/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

07/22/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Bail Bond

07/01/2021: Bail Bond

Criminal: Minute Order

06/30/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

06/25/2021: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order (Amended)

06/25/2021: Criminal: Minute Order (Amended)

Criminal: Minute Order

06/25/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketProof: Community Service; Judicial Officer: TBA, Judge; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketProof; Judicial Officer: TBA, Judge; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DispositionProbation; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC273.5(a): Inflict Corporal Injury On Spouse/Cohabitant; Probation; Adult Confinement; Type: Straight Local; Facility: County Jail; Start Date: 08/23/2021; Term Type: Confinement; Term: 6 Days; Credit for Time Served - Actual: 3 Days; Conduct Credit: 3 Days; Comment: Count 1 Misdemeanor (credit for time served); Probation; Type: Conditional Revocable Release; Start Date: 08/23/2021; Term: 3 Years; End Date: 08/22/2024; Status; Status: Active; Date: 08/23/2021; Fee Totals; $150.00; $30.00; $40.00; $400.00; $25.00; Fee Totals; $645.00; Programs; BTP: 52 Week Class; Ordered; Party: Chavez, Arturo Marmolejo, III; Order Date: 08/23/2021; Enroll by Date: 09/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC273.5(a): Inflict Corporal Injury On Spouse/Cohabitant; Conviction - Sentenced-Plea of Guilty/Nolo Contendere

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC273.5(a): Inflict Corporal Injury On Spouse/Cohabitant; No Contest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • FinancialChavez, Arturo Marmolejo, III; Transaction Assessment; $645.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketBail Bond Exonerated; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketDefense Counsel Concurred in Defendants Plea or Admission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketConviction Certified by Clerk of the Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketCourt Found Plea Knowledgeable; Intelligently Made Voluntary

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketBail Bond Booking Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBail Bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Gates, Kathryn; Defendant: Chavez, Arturo Marmolejo, III; Deputy Public Defender: Lee, Beth A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketBail Review; Original Type: Bail Review; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC273.5(a): Inflict Corporal Injury On Spouse/Cohabitant; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketOrder: Criminal Protective; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Min, Thomas Keynes; Defendant: Chavez, Arturo Marmolejo, III; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Chavez, Arturo Marmolejo, III; Charge #: 001; Description: PC273.5(a): Inflict Corporal Injury On Spouse/Cohabitant; Statute: 273.5(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lee, Beth A

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrade, Vincent