This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 06/10/2020 at 01:22:53 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Arthur David Ferris, Jr, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 08/09/2018 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Arthur David Ferris, Jr, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Slocum, Steven, Howell, Steven J. and Kirihara, John. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4271

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    New Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Slocum, Steven

Howell, Steven J.

Kirihara, John

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Ferris, Arthur David, Junior

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sadhwani, Anil Kamal

Enero, Natalia Ruth

Defendant Attorneys

Meyer, Derek Scott

Rhee, Christopher

 

Court Documents

Declaration

05/12/2020: Declaration

Standing Order #2020-04 Notice of Hearing Change

04/03/2020: Standing Order #2020-04 Notice of Hearing Change

Criminal: Minute Order

02/24/2020: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

01/13/2020: Criminal: Minute Order

Courtesy Notice - Warrant Arraignment

12/26/2019: Courtesy Notice - Warrant Arraignment

Criminal: Minute Order

03/11/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

CR Criminal Courtesy Notice

02/19/2019: CR Criminal Courtesy Notice

Criminal: Minute Order

11/19/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

10/01/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

08/28/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

CR Criminal Courtesy Notice

08/15/2018: CR Criminal Courtesy Notice

Notice

08/09/2018: Notice

Complaint

08/09/2018: Complaint

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStanding Order #2020-04 Notice of Hearing Change (COVID-19)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Original Type: Pre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Sadhwani, Anil Kamal; Defendant: Ferris, Arthur David, Junior; Deputy Public Defender: Rhee, Christopher

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Warrant; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Ferris, Arthur David, Junior

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourtesy Notice - Notice to Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketCitation: Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • DocketWarrant: Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Warrant; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketWarrant: Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Howell, Steven J.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Enero, Natalia Ruth; Defendant: Ferris, Arthur David, Junior; Deputy Public Defender: Meyer, Derek Scott

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Charges; Charge Number: 001; HS11377: Possession of Controlled Substance; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Ferris, Arthur David, Junior

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourtesy Notice - Notice to Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Ferris, Arthur David, Junior; Charge #: 001; Description: HS11377: Possession of Controlled Substance; Statute: 11377; Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less