Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 05/24/2020 at 16:07:20 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Antonio Rosales, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 05/18/2016 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Antonio Rosales, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are McNatt, Bobby W., Kirihara, John, Moranda, David, Bacciarini, Mark, Jacobs, Harry and Lo, Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3349

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Merced County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

McNatt, Bobby W.

Kirihara, John

Moranda, David

Bacciarini, Mark

Jacobs, Harry

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Rosales, Antonio

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mckinney, Michael C

Serratto, Matthew Travers

Compton, Misty

Martinez, Mathew Joseph

Defendant Attorneys

Samrao, Ramnik S

Jamieson, Stephanie L

Meyer, Derek Scott

Andrade, Vincent

Green, Anthony C

Loethen, Christopher Paul

 

Court Documents

Transfer Receipt

05/07/2018: Transfer Receipt

Transfer Order

03/08/2018: Transfer Order

Criminal: Minute Order

03/08/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Notice

12/29/2017: Notice

Notice

12/29/2017: Notice

Probation Orders

10/11/2017: Probation Orders

Criminal: Minute Order

10/11/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order (Supplemental)

08/02/2017: Criminal: Minute Order (Supplemental)

Criminal: Minute Order

08/02/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Motion

07/25/2017: Motion

Affidavit of Probation Violation

12/30/2016: Affidavit of Probation Violation

Probation Orders

08/05/2016: Probation Orders

Order

07/01/2016: Order

* Public *

07/01/2016: * Public *

Motion

06/21/2016: Motion

Motion

06/14/2016: Motion

Information

06/07/2016: Information

Complaint

05/18/2016: Complaint

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTransfer Receipt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTransfer Order; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTransfer Out; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Rosales, Antonio

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProbation Orders

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketModification; Judicial Officer: Bacciarini, Mark; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Rosales, Antonio; Deputy Public Defender: Jamieson, Stephanie L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • FinancialRosales, Antonio; Transaction Assessment; $1000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • FinancialRosales, Antonio; Transaction Assessment; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • FinancialRosales, Antonio; Transaction Assessment; $780.00

    Read MoreRead Less
57 More Docket Entries
  • 04/27/2016
  • ChargeCharges: Rosales, Antonio; Charge #: 004; Description: PC243(d): Battery With Serious Bodily Injury; Statute: 243(d); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2016
  • ChargeCharges: Rosales, Antonio; Charge #: 003; Description: **PC186.22(a): Street Gang Act; Statute: 186.22(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2016
  • ChargeCharges: Rosales, Antonio; Charge #: 002; Description: **PC186.22(b)(1)(B): Serious Felony Convic Street Gang Activity (ENHANCEMENT); Statute: 186.22(b)(1)(B); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2016
  • ChargeCharges: Rosales, Antonio; Charge #: 002; Description: **PC243(d): Battery With Serious Bodily Injury; Statute: 243(d); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2016
  • ChargeCharges: Rosales, Antonio; Charge #: 001; Description: **PC186.22(b)(1)(C): Violent Felony Convic-Participate Street Gang (ENHANCEMENT); Statute: 186.22(b)(1)(C); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2016
  • ChargeCharges: Rosales, Antonio; Charge #: 001; Description: PC186.22(b)(1)(C): Violent Felony Convic-Participate Street Gang (ENHANCEMENT); Statute: 186.22(b)(1)(C); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2016
  • ChargeCharges: Rosales, Antonio; Charge #: 001; Description: **PC12022.7(a): GBI:Great Bodily Injury; Statute: 12022.7(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2016
  • ChargeCharges: Rosales, Antonio; Charge #: 001; Description: PC12022.7(a): GBI:Great Bodily Injury; Statute: 12022.7(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2016
  • ChargeCharges: Rosales, Antonio; Charge #: 001; Description: **PC245(a)(4): Assault-Force Likely to Produce GBI; Statute: 245(a)(4); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2016
  • ChargeCharges: Rosales, Antonio; Charge #: 001; Description: PC245(a)(4): Assault-Force Likely to Produce GBI; Statute: 245(a)(4); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mckinney, Michael C

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARTINEZ, MATHEW JOSEPH

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Compton, Misty