This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 10/01/2021 at 17:05:00 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Antonio David Jacobo III, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 09/03/2021 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Antonio David Jacobo III, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Slocum, Steven and Hollman, James. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4170

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Slocum, Steven

Hollman, James

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Jacobo, Antonio David, III

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Min, Thomas Keynes

Gates, Kathryn

Defendant Attorneys

Andrade, Vincent

Meyer, Derek Scott

Sok, Curtis Bonghoon

 

Court Documents

Abstract of Judgment

09/29/2021: Abstract of Judgment

Felony Advisement of Rights, Waiver and Plea Form

09/22/2021: Felony Advisement of Rights, Waiver and Plea Form

Criminal: Minute Order

09/22/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Declaration

09/14/2021: Declaration

Criminal: Minute Order

09/13/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

09/09/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

09/03/2021: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

09/03/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2021
  • FinancialJacobo, Antonio David, III; CDCR - State Prison Credit; $600.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketCourt Collections Follow-up

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketPreliminary Examination; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DispositionPrison; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC273.5(a): Inflict Corporal Injury On Spouse/Cohabitant; Prison; Adult Confinement; Type: Prison; Facility: California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation; Start Date: 09/22/2021; Term Type: Lower; Term: 2 Years; Credit for Time Served - Actual: 22 Days; Conduct Credit: 22 Days; Comment: Count 1- Felony; Fee Totals; $40.00; $30.00; $600.00; Fee Totals; $670.00; Condition - Adult

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC273.5(a): Inflict Corporal Injury On Spouse/Cohabitant; Conviction - Sentenced-Plea of Guilty/Nolo Contendere; Charge Number: 002; PC136.1(b)(1): Prevent/Dissuade Witness/Victim - Reporting; Dism: Motion of the People

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC273.5(a): Inflict Corporal Injury On Spouse/Cohabitant; No Contest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • FinancialJacobo, Antonio David, III; Transaction Assessment; $670.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketDefense Counsel Concurred in Defendants Plea or Admission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketConviction Certified by Clerk of the Court

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketBail Review; Original Type: Bail Review; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Gates, Kathryn; Defendant: Jacobo, Antonio David, III; Deputy Public Defender: Meyer, Derek Scott

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketBail Review Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Hollman, James; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC273.5(a): Inflict Corporal Injury On Spouse/Cohabitant; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 002; PC136.1(b)(1): Prevent/Dissuade Witness/Victim - Reporting; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketOrder: Criminal Protective; Judicial Officer: Hollman, James

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Hollman, James; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Min, Thomas Keynes; Defendant: Jacobo, Antonio David, III; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Jacobo, Antonio David, III; Charge #: 002; Description: PC136.1(b)(1): Prevent/Dissuade Witness/Victim - Reporting; Statute: 136.1(b)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Jacobo, Antonio David, III; Charge #: 001; Description: PC273.5(a): Inflict Corporal Injury On Spouse/Cohabitant; Statute: 273.5(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Meyer, Derek Scott

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sok, Curtis Bonghoon

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrade, Vincent