This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 06/09/2020 at 17:12:23 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Antonio David Jacobo, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 07/13/2018 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Antonio David Jacobo, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Schechter, Jeanne, Hollman, James, Kirihara, John, Ash, Carol, Breen, Thomas P., Bacciarini, Mark, Jacobs, Harry, Nakahara, Vernon K., LaPorte, James and Lo, Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3522

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Schechter, Jeanne

Hollman, James

Kirihara, John

Ash, Carol

Breen, Thomas P.

Bacciarini, Mark

Jacobs, Harry

Nakahara, Vernon K.

LaPorte, James

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Jacobo, Antonio David

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

McCoy, Tyson John

Margain, Andre Carlos

Compton, Misty

McKean, Tyler

McAfee, Michael

Nored, Thane

Bakich, Donna

Gates, Kathryn

Wall, Walter W.

Min, Thomas Keynes

Turner, Leslie Allan

Defendant Attorneys

Albertoni, Susan L

Lee, Beth A

Andrade, Vincent

Sok, Curtis Bonghoon

Boortz, Kimberly Ann

Jamieson, Stephanie L

 

Court Documents

Release Order

09/04/2019: Release Order

Criminal: Minute Order

09/04/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Notice

08/21/2019: Notice

Declaration

08/20/2019: Declaration

Declaration

08/19/2019: Declaration

Criminal: Minute Order

08/19/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Declaration

08/16/2019: Declaration

Criminal: Minute Order

08/16/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

08/12/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

08/12/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

08/07/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

08/01/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

07/24/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

07/10/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

07/05/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

07/03/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Notice

07/01/2019: Notice

Criminal: Minute Order

06/28/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2019
  • DispositionAmended Probation; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC29800(a)(1): Felon In Possession Of Firearm; Probation; Probation; Type: Formal; Start Date: 09/10/2018; Term: 36 Months; End Date: 09/04/2019; Status; Status: Active; Date: 09/10/2018; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 10/15/2018; Status; Status: Reinstated; Date: 10/24/2018; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 11/09/2018; Status; Status: Revoked/Reinstated; Date: 11/14/2018; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 11/30/2018; Status; Status: Reinstated; Date: 12/04/2018; Status; Status: Revoked/Reinstated; Date: 01/23/2019; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 06/10/2019; Status; Status: Terminated; Date: 09/04/2019; Fee Totals; $40.00; $30.00; Fee Totals; $70.00; Adult Confinement; Type: Straight Local; Facility: County Jail; Start Date: 11/14/2018; Term Type: Confinement; Term: 45 Days; Credit for Time Served - Actual: 3 Days; Comment: VOP #1; Adult Confinement; Type: Prison; Facility: California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation; Start Date: 09/04/2019; Term Type: Lower; Term: 16 Months; Credit for Time Served - Actual: 344 Days; Conduct Credit: 344 Days; Comment: credit for time served; Fee Totals; $300.00; Fee Totals; $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 009; VOP # 5 PC1203.2(a): Rearrest/Revoke Probation/Etc. (Specify Crime); VOP Admitted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 009; VOP # 5 PC1203.2(a): Rearrest/Revoke Probation/Etc. (Specify Crime); Admitted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • FinancialJacobo, Antonio David; Transaction Assessment; $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRelease Order; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketViolation of Probation; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: McCoy, Tyson John; Defendant: Jacobo, Antonio David; Contract Public Defender: Albertoni, Susan L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • DocketViolation of Probation; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
87 More Docket Entries
  • 07/19/2018
  • DocketBail Review; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Jacobo, Antonio David; Deputy Public Defender: Jamieson, Stephanie L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC29800(a)(1): Felon In Possession Of Firearm; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 002; PC30305(a)(1): Person Prohibited In Possession Of Ammunition; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 003; PC33215: Manuf. Weapon: short-barreled rifle/shotgun; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Turner, Leslie Allan; Defendant: Jacobo, Antonio David; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Jacobo, Antonio David; Charge #: 004; Description: PC1203.2(a): Rearrest/Revoke Probation/Etc. (Specify Crime); Statute: 1203.2(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Jacobo, Antonio David; Charge #: 003; Description: PC33215: Manuf. Weapon: short-barreled rifle/shotgun; Statute: 33215; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Jacobo, Antonio David; Charge #: 002; Description: PC30305(a)(1): Person Prohibited In Possession Of Ammunition; Statute: 30305(a)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Jacobo, Antonio David; Charge #: 001; Description: PC29800(a)(1): Felon In Possession Of Firearm; Statute: 29800(a)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Albertoni, Susan L

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jamieson, Stephanie L

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sok, Curtis Bonghoon