This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 03/15/2022 at 18:03:10 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Anthony Zazueta, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 01/04/2022 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Anthony Zazueta, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Slocum, Steven and Shaver, Donald. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0046

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Slocum, Steven

Shaver, Donald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Zazueta, Anthony

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Silveira, Nicole A.

Defendant Attorney

Meyer, Derek Scott

 

Court Documents

Complaint

01/04/2022: Complaint

CR Criminal Courtesy Notice

01/04/2022: CR Criminal Courtesy Notice

Criminal: Minute Order

01/13/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

01/20/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

02/01/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

02/07/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

02/28/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

03/02/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC594(a): Vandalism; Dismissed with a Harvey Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Original Type: Pre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Silveira, Nicole A.; Defendant: Zazueta, Anthony; Deputy Public Defender: Meyer, Derek Scott

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Original Type: Pre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Silveira, Nicole A.; Defendant: Zazueta, Anthony; Deputy Public Defender: Meyer, Derek Scott

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Original Type: Pre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Silveira, Nicole A.; Defendant: Zazueta, Anthony; Deputy Public Defender: Meyer, Derek Scott

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Original Type: Pre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Silveira, Nicole A.; Defendant: Zazueta, Anthony; Deputy Public Defender: Meyer, Derek Scott

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Original Type: Pre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Silveira, Nicole A.; Defendant: Zazueta, Anthony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC594(a): Vandalism; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Silveira, Nicole A.; Defendant: Zazueta, Anthony; Deputy Public Defender: Meyer, Derek Scott

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourtesy Notice - Notice to Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Zazueta, Anthony; Charge #: 001; Description: PC594(a): Vandalism; Statute: 594(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Meyer, Derek Scott