This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 10/12/2021 at 17:02:36 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Anthony Marcis Aguilar, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 09/14/2021 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Anthony Marcis Aguilar, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lo, Paul and Hansen, Ronald. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******415C

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lo, Paul

Hansen, Ronald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Aguilar, Anthony Marcis

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Colby, Travis

Compton, Misty

Defendant Attorneys

Andrade, Vincent

Lee, Beth A

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

10/04/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Release Order

09/20/2021: Release Order

Criminal: Minute Order

09/20/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

09/14/2021: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

09/14/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketPreliminary Examination; Judicial Officer: TBA, Judge; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Compton, Misty; Defendant: Aguilar, Anthony Marcis; Deputy Public Defender: Lee, Beth A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRelease Order; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketBail Review; Original Type: Bail Review; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Compton, Misty; Defendant: Aguilar, Anthony Marcis; Deputy Public Defender: Lee, Beth A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketBail Review Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketBail Review Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC4573(a) : Bringing Contraband into the Jail; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 002; PC4573.5: Bring Drugs/Alcohol Into Penal Institution; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 002; PC667(b)-(i): W/Pr Fel Conv:Serious/Violent Felony; Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Colby, Travis; Defendant: Aguilar, Anthony Marcis; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Aguilar, Anthony Marcis; Charge #: 002; Description: PC667(b)-(i): W/Pr Fel Conv:Serious/Violent Felony; Statute: 667(b)-(i); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Aguilar, Anthony Marcis; Charge #: 002; Description: PC4573.5: Bring Drugs/Alcohol Into Penal Institution; Statute: 4573.5; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Aguilar, Anthony Marcis; Charge #: 001; Description: PC4573(a) : Bringing Contraband into the Jail; Statute: 4573(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lee, Beth A

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrade, Vincent