Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 06/28/2021 at 18:01:34 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Angelo Preston Guzman, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 04/29/2021 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Angelo Preston Guzman, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Slocum, Steven and Lo, Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******932A

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Merced County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Slocum, Steven

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Guzman, Angelo Preston

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Boyer, Kayla A

Silveira, Nicole A.

Rosenthal, Sara R

Gates, Kathryn

Defendant Attorneys

Johnson, Mark A

Sok, Curtis Bonghoon

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

06/07/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

05/27/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Consolidated Complaint

04/29/2021: Consolidated Complaint

Memorandum: Points and Authorities

04/16/2021: Memorandum: Points and Authorities

Motion

04/16/2021: Motion

Declaration

02/01/2021: Declaration

Order

12/11/2020: Order

Complaint

12/11/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketPreliminary Examination; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Guzman, Angelo Preston; Contract Public Defender: Johnson, Mark A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Guzman, Angelo Preston; Contract Public Defender: Johnson, Mark A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketConsolidated Complaint; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketMotion; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum: Points and Authorities

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketWarrant: Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 12/02/2020
  • ChargeCharges: Guzman, Angelo Preston; Charge #: 002; Description: PC667(a)(1): Prior Serious Felony (ENHANCEMENT-SPEC ALLEG); Statute: 667(a)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • ChargeCharges: Guzman, Angelo Preston; Charge #: 002; Description: PC667(b)-(i): W/Pr Fel Conv:Serious/Violent Felony; Statute: 667(b)-(i); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • ChargeCharges: Guzman, Angelo Preston; Charge #: 002; Description: PC12022.53(c): Fire Firearm; Statute: 12022.53(c); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • ChargeCharges: Guzman, Angelo Preston; Charge #: 002; Description: PC189: Offense Was Willful, Deliberate, Premeditated; Statute: 189; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • ChargeCharges: Guzman, Angelo Preston; Charge #: 002; Description: PC187(a): Killing of Human Being w/Malice Aforethought; Statute: 187(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • ChargeCharges: Guzman, Angelo Preston; Charge #: 001; Description: PC667(a)(1): Prior Serious Felony (ENHANCEMENT-SPEC ALLEG); Statute: 667(a)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • ChargeCharges: Guzman, Angelo Preston; Charge #: 001; Description: PC667(b)-(i): W/Pr Fel Conv:Serious/Violent Felony; Statute: 667(b)-(i); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • ChargeCharges: Guzman, Angelo Preston; Charge #: 001; Description: PC12022.53(d): F/Arm:GBI:Com/F; Statute: 12022.53(d); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • ChargeCharges: Guzman, Angelo Preston; Charge #: 001; Description: PC189: Offense Was Willful, Deliberate, Premeditated; Statute: 189; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • ChargeCharges: Guzman, Angelo Preston; Charge #: 001; Description: PC664/187(a) PC190.2(a)(1): Attempted Murder; Statute: 664/187(a)PC190.2(a)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gates, Kathryn

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rosenthal, Sara R

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Boyer, Kayla A