This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 05/31/2020 at 02:16:19 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Angel Gonzalez, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 04/10/2017 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Angel Gonzalez, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Schechter, Jeanne, McNatt, Bobby W., Shaver, Donald, Ash, Carol, Moranda, David, Bacciarini, Mark, Jacobs, Harry, Dougherty, Frank and Lo, Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0983

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Schechter, Jeanne

McNatt, Bobby W.

Shaver, Donald

Ash, Carol

Moranda, David

Bacciarini, Mark

Jacobs, Harry

Dougherty, Frank

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Gonzalez, Angel Hernandez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

McKean, Tyler

McConney, Adam D

Gates, Kathryn

Wall, Walter W.

McKinney, Ilia C.

Silveira, Nicole A.

Turner, Leslie Allan

Defendant Attorneys

Freitas, Wade

Merced Defense Assocation+

Lope, Armando

Tran, Jennifer Le

Howard, Sean

Johnson, Mark A

Andrade, Vincent

Green, Anthony C

Davis, William A

Berger, Richard

 

Court Documents

Complaint

03/10/2015: Complaint

Waiver

04/01/2015: Waiver

Order

02/17/2017: Order

Criminal: Minute Order

09/07/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

09/11/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Release Order

09/11/2017: Release Order

Criminal: Minute Order

11/16/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2017
  • DispositionAmended Probation; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC273.5(a): Inflict Corporal Injury On Spouse/Cohabitant; Probation; Probation; Type: Conditional Revocable Release; Start Date: 01/08/2016; Term: 36 Months; End Date: 09/28/2019; Status; Status: Active; Date: 01/08/2016; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 06/20/2016; Status; Status: Reinstated; Date: 03/10/2017; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 11/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • DispositionAmended Probation with Program; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC273.5(a): Inflict Corporal Injury On Spouse/Cohabitant; Probation with Program; Probation; Type: Conditional Revocable Release; Start Date: 01/08/2016; Term: 36 Months; End Date: 09/28/2019; Status; Status: Active; Date: 01/08/2016; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 06/20/2016; Status; Status: Reinstated; Date: 03/10/2017; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 11/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • ChargeCharges: Gonzalez, Angel Hernandez; Charge #: 004; Description: PC1203.2(a): Rearrest/Revoke Probation/Etc. (Specify Crime); Statute: 1203.2(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • DocketWarrant: Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • DocketProbation is revoked; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProgress Report; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Charges; Charge Number: 003; PC1203.2(a): Rearrest/Revoke Probation/Etc. (Specify Crime); VOP Admitted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Charges; Charge Number: 003; PC1203.2(a): Rearrest/Revoke Probation/Etc. (Specify Crime); Admitted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRelease Order; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketViolation of Probation; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: McKean, Tyler; Defendant: Gonzalez, Angel Hernandez; Deputy Public Defender: Tran, Jennifer Le

    Read MoreRead Less
57 More Docket Entries
  • 03/16/2015
  • DocketBail Review; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2015
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: McKinney, Ilia C.; Defendant: Gonzalez, Angel Hernandez; Deputy Public Defender: Howard, Sean

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2015
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC273.5(a): Inflict Corporal Injury On Spouse/Cohabitant; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2015
  • DocketConfidential Historical Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2015
  • DocketReferred to Probation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2015
  • Docket60-Day Rule; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2015
  • DocketConfidential Historical Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2015
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Silveira, Nicole A.; Defendant: Gonzalez, Angel Hernandez; Deputy Public Defender: Berger, Richard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2015
  • ChargeCharges: Gonzalez, Angel Hernandez; Charge #: 001; Description: PC273.5(a): Inflict Corporal Injury On Spouse/Cohabitant; Statute: 273.5(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer McConney, Adam D

Latest cases represented by Lawyer McKean, Tyler

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Turner, Leslie Allan