This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 03/18/2022 at 13:01:33 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Andrew Michael Cline, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 03/17/2022 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Andrew Michael Cline, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ash, Carol and Lo, Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1436

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ash, Carol

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Cline, Andrew Michael

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Attwell, Joseph Evans

Defendant Attorney

Andrade, Vincent

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

03/17/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

03/17/2022: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketPreliminary Examination; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketBail Review; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC422: Threaten Crime w/Intent to Terrorize; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 001; PC12022(b)(1): Spec. Alleg. - Use Of Deadly Weapon; Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketOrder: Criminal Protective; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Attwell, Joseph Evans; Defendant: Cline, Andrew Michael; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Cline, Andrew Michael; Charge #: 001; Description: PC12022(b)(1): Spec. Alleg. - Use Of Deadly Weapon; Statute: 12022(b)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Cline, Andrew Michael; Charge #: 001; Description: PC422: Threaten Crime w/Intent to Terrorize; Statute: 422; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrade, Vincent