This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 06/08/2020 at 20:37:11 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Andrew Dior Mark, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 06/05/2018 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Andrew Dior Mark, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Bissig, Louis F., Hashimoto, Roy, Schechter, Jeanne, Shaver, Donald, Howell, Steven J., Fredricks, Josh M., Slocum, Steven, Papadakis, H. N. and Lo, Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2619

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Bissig, Louis F.

Hashimoto, Roy

Schechter, Jeanne

Shaver, Donald

Howell, Steven J.

Fredricks, Josh M.

Slocum, Steven

Papadakis, H. N.

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Mark, Andrew Dior

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Drexel, Scott Gregory

Enero, Natalia Ruth

Compton, Misty

Asdorian, Blake M

Heil, Austin Brooke

Egan, Gerad Denis

Defendant Attorneys

McInally, Nicholas Bernard

Andrade, Vincent

Page, Kathleen Coleen

Miller, Rachel Kohlman

Howard, Sean

Berger, Richard

Noguera, Michael Anthony

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

09/20/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Returned Mail

09/09/2019: Returned Mail

Criminal: Minute Order

09/06/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

08/28/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Notice of Hearing

08/26/2019: Notice of Hearing

Criminal: Minute Order

06/19/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

06/17/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

05/14/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

05/13/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

02/13/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

12/31/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

12/05/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Misdemeanor Advisement of Rights, Waiver and Plea Form

09/28/2018: Misdemeanor Advisement of Rights, Waiver and Plea Form

Criminal: Minute Order

09/28/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Motion

09/21/2018: Motion

Criminal: Minute Order

09/10/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

07/23/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

06/29/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2019
  • DocketModification; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant; Deputy Public Defender: Page, Kathleen Coleen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Warrant; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant; Deputy Public Defender: Page, Kathleen Coleen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturned Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketModification; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Heil, Austin Brooke; Defendant; Deputy Public Defender: Page, Kathleen Coleen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketWarrant: Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketRequest to Appear (With Fee)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProgress Report; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • DocketOrder: Request for Hearing on Protective Order Modification; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Warrant; Judicial Officer: Fredricks, Josh M.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Mark, Andrew Dior

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 06/06/2018
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC243(e)(1): Battery on Spouse or any person with whom the defendant is cohabiting with; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 002; PC273.6(a): Violate Court Order-Prevent Domestic Violence; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 003; PC166(a)(4): Willful Disobedience Of Court Order; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • DocketOrder: Criminal Protective; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Mark, Andrew Dior; Deputy Public Defender: Berger, Richard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Mark, Andrew Dior; Charge #: 005; Description: PC1203.2(a): Rearrest/Revoke Probation/Etc. (Specify Crime); Statute: 1203.2(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Mark, Andrew Dior; Charge #: 004; Description: PC1203.2(a): Rearrest/Revoke Probation/Etc. (Specify Crime); Statute: 1203.2(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Mark, Andrew Dior; Charge #: 003; Description: PC166(a)(4): Willful Disobedience Of Court Order; Statute: 166(a)(4); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Mark, Andrew Dior; Charge #: 002; Description: PC273.6(a): Violate Court Order-Prevent Domestic Violence; Statute: 273.6(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Mark, Andrew Dior; Charge #: 001; Description: PC243(e)(1): Battery on Spouse or any person with whom the defendant is cohabiting with; Statute: 243(e)(1); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Drexel, Scott Gregory

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Heil, Austin Brooke

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Egan, Gerad Denis