This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 03/09/2022 at 18:03:18 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Andres EsquivelHigareda, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 12/29/2021 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Andres EsquivelHigareda, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ash, Carol, Hollman, James and Slocum, Steven. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6308

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ash, Carol

Hollman, James

Slocum, Steven

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

EsquivelHigareda, Andres

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Rosenthal, Sara R

Serratto, Matthew Travers

Gates, Kathryn

Margain, Andre Carlos

Defendant Attorneys

Noguera, Michael Anthony

Carasso, Alexander Louis

Meyer, Derek Scott

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

12/29/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

12/29/2021: Complaint

Bail Bond 555270446-1

12/30/2021: Bail Bond 555270446-1

Criminal: Minute Order

01/05/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

01/05/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Declaration

01/05/2022: Declaration

Criminal: Minute Order

01/26/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

02/09/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

02/23/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Minute Order - Printed copy with signature

02/23/2022: Minute Order - Printed copy with signature

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketFirearms Relinquishment Hearing; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketProof; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketPreliminary Examination; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketTranscript

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DispositionProbation; Charges; Charge Number: 002; PC243(e)(1): Battery on Spouse or any person with whom the defendant is cohabiting with; Probation; Adult Confinement; Type: Straight Local; Facility: County Jail; Start Date: 02/23/2022; Term Type: Confinement; Term: 3 Days; Credit for Time Served - Actual: 3 Days; Comment: count 2- misdemeanor (credit for time served.); Probation; Type: Conditional Revocable Release; Start Date: 02/23/2022; Term: 3 Years; End Date: 02/22/2025; Status; Status: Active; Date: 02/23/2022; Programs; BTP: 52 Week Class; Ordered; Party: EsquivelHigareda, Andres; Order Date: 02/23/2022; Fee Totals; $220.00; $100.00; $500.00; Fee Totals; $820.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC245(a)(4): Assault-Force Likely to Produce GBI; Dism: Motion of the People; Charge Number: 002; PC243(e)(1): Battery on Spouse or any person with whom the defendant is cohabiting with; Conviction - Sentenced-Plea of Guilty/Nolo Contendere

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Charges; Charge Number: 002; PC243(e)(1): Battery on Spouse or any person with whom the defendant is cohabiting with; No Contest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • FinancialEsquivelHigareda, Andres; Transaction Assessment; $820.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order - Printed copy with signature

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketFirearm Relinquishment Packet

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketBail Review; Original Type: Bail Review; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant; Deputy Public Defender: Meyer, Derek Scott

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketBail Bond Booking Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBail Bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketOrder: Criminal Protective; Judicial Officer: Hollman, James

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Hollman, James; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Rosenthal, Sara R; Defendant: EsquivelHigareda, Andres; Deputy Public Defender: Carasso, Alexander Louis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • ChargeCharges: EsquivelHigareda, Andres; Charge #: 002; Description: PC243(e)(1): Battery on Spouse or any person with whom the defendant is cohabiting with; Statute: 243(e)(1); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • ChargeCharges: EsquivelHigareda, Andres; Charge #: 001; Description: PC245(a)(4): Assault-Force Likely to Produce GBI; Statute: 245(a)(4); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Noguera, Michael Anthony

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Carasso, Alexander

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Meyer, Derek Scott