This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 03/17/2022 at 18:08:29 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Amos Andrew Beavers JR, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 01/10/2022 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Amos Andrew Beavers JR, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lo, Paul, Slocum, Steven and Hansen, Ronald. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0178

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lo, Paul

Slocum, Steven

Hansen, Ronald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Beavers, Amos Andrew, Junior

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Rosenthal, Sara R

Gates, Kathryn

Silveira, Nicole A.

Defendant Attorneys

Coughlin, Michael

Meyer, Derek Scott

Partin, Lauri L

Carasso, Alexander Louis

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

01/10/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

01/10/2022: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

01/13/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

01/13/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

01/18/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

01/21/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Bail Bond SV50-5193020

01/26/2022: Bail Bond SV50-5193020

Criminal: Minute Order

03/07/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Information

03/11/2022: Information

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketArraignment: Information; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInformation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC273.5(a): Inflict Corporal Injury On Spouse/Cohabitant; Held to Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketWitness and Exhibit Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPreliminary Examination; Original Type: Preliminary Examination; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Gates, Kathryn; Defendant: Beavers, Amos Andrew, Junior; Deputy Public Defender: Carasso, Alexander Louis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketBail Bond Booking Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBail Bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketBail Review; Original Type: Bail Review; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Gates, Kathryn; Defendant: Beavers, Amos Andrew, Junior; Deputy Public Defender: Carasso, Alexander Louis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketBail Review Report

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketOrder: Criminal Protective; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Rosenthal, Sara R; Defendant: Beavers, Amos Andrew, Junior; Deputy Public Defender: Coughlin, Michael

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Beavers, Amos Andrew, Junior; Charge #: 001; Description: **EC1109 : Prior Domestic Violence Evidence; Statute: 1109; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Beavers, Amos Andrew, Junior; Charge #: 001; Description: **PC667(b)-(i): W/Pr Fel Conv:Serious/Violent Felony; Statute: 667(b)-(i); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Beavers, Amos Andrew, Junior; Charge #: 001; Description: **California Rule of Court-rule 4.421: Factors In Aggravation; Statute: CRC4.421; Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Beavers, Amos Andrew, Junior; Charge #: 001; Description: **PC273.5(a): Inflict Corporal Injury On Spouse/Cohabitant; Statute: 273.5(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Beavers, Amos Andrew, Junior; Charge #: 001; Description: PC273.5(a): Inflict Corporal Injury On Spouse/Cohabitant; Statute: 273.5(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Partin, Lauri L

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Carasso, Alexander

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Coughlin, Michael