This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 10/31/2021 at 18:02:09 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Amalia Garcia

Case Summary

On 09/01/2021 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Amalia Garcia. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Los Banos Division located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Moranda, David, Lo, Paul, McCabe, Brian and Breen, Thomas P.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4085

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Moranda, David

Lo, Paul

McCabe, Brian

Breen, Thomas P.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Garcia, Amalia

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Rosenthal, Sara R

Colacito, Anthony Michael

Defendant Attorneys

Andrade, Vincent

Green, Anthony Charles

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

09/01/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

09/01/2021: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

09/08/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

09/24/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

10/08/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

10/22/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketFurther Proceedings; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFurther Proceedings; Judicial Officer: Breen, Thomas P.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Colacito, Anthony Michael; Defendant: Garcia, Amalia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DispositionProbation with Program; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC273.6(a): Violate Court Order-Prevent Domestic Violence; Probation with Program; Probation; Type: Conditional Revocable Release; Start Date: 10/08/2021; Term: 3 Years; End Date: 10/07/2024; Status; Status: Active; Date: 10/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC273.6(a): Violate Court Order-Prevent Domestic Violence; Conviction - Sentenced-Plea of Guilty/Nolo Contendere

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC273.6(a): Violate Court Order-Prevent Domestic Violence; No Contest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketDefense Counsel Concurred in Defendants Plea or Admission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketConviction Certified by Clerk of the Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketCourt Found Plea Knowledgeable; Intelligently Made Voluntary

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketRight to Confront And Cross Examine Witnesses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketPrivilege Against Compulsory Self-Incrimination

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketTime Waived for Sentencing; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Colacito, Anthony Michael; Defendant: Garcia, Amalia; Deputy Public Defender: Green, Anthony Charles

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Colacito, Anthony Michael; Defendant: Garcia, Amalia; Deputy Public Defender: Green, Anthony Charles

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Colacito, Anthony Michael; Defendant: Garcia, Amalia; Deputy Public Defender: Green, Anthony Charles

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketOrder: Criminal Protective; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Rosenthal, Sara R; Defendant: Garcia, Amalia; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Garcia, Amalia; Charge #: 001; Description: PC273.6(a): Violate Court Order-Prevent Domestic Violence; Statute: 273.6(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Green, Anthony Charles

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrade, Vincent