This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 11/05/2021 at 17:04:54 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Alizha Edward Cooksey, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 10/08/2021 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Alizha Edward Cooksey, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lo, Paul and Slocum, Steven. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4950

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lo, Paul

Slocum, Steven

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendants

Cooksey, Alizha Edward

Winzer, Alizha Edward

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Margain, Andre Carlos

Compton, Misty

Defendant Attorneys

Andrade, Vincent

Lamas, Fernando

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

10/08/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

10/08/2021: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

10/25/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: TBA, Judge; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Cooksey, Alizha Edward; Deputy Public Defender: Lamas, Fernando

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • FinancialCooksey, Alizha Edward; Counter Payment; Receipt # CRIM-2021-01111; Cooksey, Alizha Edward; $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • FinancialCooksey, Alizha Edward; Transaction Assessment; $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 001; VC23153(a): DUI of Alcohol with Bodily Injury; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 001; VC23578: BAC .15 or Higher or refusal to take chemical test(ENHANCEMENT-SPEC ALLEG); Denied; Charge Number: 002; VC23153(b): DUI .08 Alcohol With Bodily Injury; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 002; VC23578: BAC .15 or Higher or refusal to take chemical test(ENHANCEMENT-SPEC ALLEG); Denied; Charge Number: 003; VC20002(a): Hit And Run-Fail to Stop; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketPretrial Electronic Monitoring Program Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Margain, Andre Carlos; Defendant: Cooksey, Alizha Edward; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Cooksey, Alizha Edward; Charge #: 003; Description: VC20002(a): Hit And Run-Fail to Stop; Statute: 20002(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Cooksey, Alizha Edward; Charge #: 002; Description: VC23578: BAC .15 or Higher or refusal to take chemical test(ENHANCEMENT-SPEC ALLEG); Statute: 23578; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Cooksey, Alizha Edward; Charge #: 002; Description: VC23153(b): DUI .08 Alcohol With Bodily Injury; Statute: 23153(b); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Cooksey, Alizha Edward; Charge #: 001; Description: VC23578: BAC .15 or Higher or refusal to take chemical test(ENHANCEMENT-SPEC ALLEG); Statute: 23578; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Cooksey, Alizha Edward; Charge #: 001; Description: VC23153(a): DUI of Alcohol with Bodily Injury; Statute: 23153(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Margain, Andre Carlos