This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 03/18/2022 at 18:48:54 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Alfonso Jose Robledo, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 01/05/2022 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Alfonso Jose Robledo, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lo, Paul, Hansen, Ronald and Ash, Carol. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0081

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lo, Paul

Hansen, Ronald

Ash, Carol

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Robledo, Alfonso Jose

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Elgin, David

Asdorian, Blake M.

Egan, Gerad Denis

Defendant Attorneys

Andrade, Vincent

Foster, Doug C

Siegel, Mark Lloyd

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

01/05/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

01/05/2022: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

01/10/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

01/31/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

02/28/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Information

03/07/2022: Information

Criminal: Minute Order

03/15/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketJury Trial; Judicial Officer: TBA, Judge; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketReadiness Conference; Judicial Officer: TBA, Judge; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Charges; Charge Number: 001; **VC2800.2: Evade Peace Officer Reckless Driving; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 001; **PC1203(e)(4): W/Pr Fel Conv (ENHANCEMENT); Denied; Charge Number: 001; **PC1170.12: Strike Prior; Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Information; Original Type: Arraignment: Information; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Egan, Gerad Denis; Defendant: Robledo, Alfonso Jose; Contract Public Defender: Siegel, Mark Lloyd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketTranscript

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInformation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Charges; Charge Number: 001; VC2800.2: Evade Peace Officer Reckless Driving; Held to Answer; Charge Number: 001; PC1203(e)(4): W/Pr Fel Conv (ENHANCEMENT); Held to Answer; Charge Number: 001; PC1170.12: Strike Prior; Held to Answer; Charge Number: 002; VC4000(a)(1): No Evidence of Current Registration (POC); Not Held to Answer; Charge Number: 003; VC22450(a): Failure To Stop At Stop Sign (TSE); Not Held to Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPreliminary Examination; Original Type: Preliminary Examination; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Egan, Gerad Denis; Defendant: Robledo, Alfonso Jose; Contract Public Defender: Siegel, Mark Lloyd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Egan, Gerad Denis; Defendant: Robledo, Alfonso Jose; Contract Public Defender: Siegel, Mark Lloyd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketBail Review; Original Type: Bail Review; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Elgin, David; Defendant: Robledo, Alfonso Jose; Contract Public Defender: Foster, Doug C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Robledo, Alfonso Jose; Charge #: 003; Description: VC22450(a): Failure To Stop At Stop Sign (TSE); Statute: 22450(a); Level: Infraction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Robledo, Alfonso Jose; Charge #: 002; Description: VC4000(a)(1): No Evidence of Current Registration (POC); Statute: 4000(a)(1); Level: Infraction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Robledo, Alfonso Jose; Charge #: 001; Description: **PC1170.12: Strike Prior; Statute: 1170.12; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Robledo, Alfonso Jose; Charge #: 001; Description: PC1170.12: Strike Prior; Statute: 1170.12; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Robledo, Alfonso Jose; Charge #: 001; Description: **PC1203(e)(4): W/Pr Fel Conv (ENHANCEMENT); Statute: 1203(e)(4); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Robledo, Alfonso Jose; Charge #: 001; Description: PC1203(e)(4): W/Pr Fel Conv (ENHANCEMENT); Statute: 1203(e)(4); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Robledo, Alfonso Jose; Charge #: 001; Description: **VC2800.2: Evade Peace Officer Reckless Driving; Statute: 2800.2; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Robledo, Alfonso Jose; Charge #: 001; Description: VC2800.2: Evade Peace Officer Reckless Driving; Statute: 2800.2; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Siegel, Mark Lloyd

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Foster, Doug C

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrade, Vincent