Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 06/03/2020 at 01:33:53 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Alexis Padin, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 09/06/2017 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Alexis Padin, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Tsenin, Ksenia, Schechter, Jeanne, Mewhinney, Douglas V., Ash, Carol, Breen, Thomas P., Kirihara, John and Lo, Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5480

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Merced County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Tsenin, Ksenia

Schechter, Jeanne

Mewhinney, Douglas V.

Ash, Carol

Breen, Thomas P.

Kirihara, John

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Padin, Alexis Omar

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nored, Thane

Martinez, Mathew Joseph

Rosenthal, Sara R

Compton, Misty

Silveira, Nicole A.

Turner, Leslie Allan

Defendant Attorneys

Samrao, Ramnik S

Coughlin, Michael

Lee, Beth A

Meyer, Derek Scott

Lope, Armando

Andrade, Vincent

Boortz, Kimberly Ann

Mclean, Todd Eugene

Berger, Richard

 

Court Documents

Order

03/16/2020: Order

Travel Request

03/16/2020: Travel Request

Criminal: Minute Order

03/06/2020: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

02/07/2020: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

12/27/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

12/23/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

08/30/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

08/23/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

07/26/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

06/14/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

05/10/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

03/22/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

03/15/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Affidavit of Probation Violation

01/17/2019: Affidavit of Probation Violation

Criminal: Minute Order (Amended)

12/12/2018: Criminal: Minute Order (Amended)

Criminal: Minute Order

10/30/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

10/26/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Probation Orders

02/15/2018: Probation Orders

76 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDrug Court Review; Original Type: Drug Court Review; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Padin, Alexis Omar; Deputy Public Defender: Lee, Beth A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketProgress Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketDrug Court Review; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketStanding Order #2020-04 Notice of Hearing Change (COVID-19)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStanding Order #2020-04 Notice of Hearing Change (COVID-19)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketDrug Court Review; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketProgress Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDrug Court Review; Original Type: Drug Court Review; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketProgress Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
139 More Docket Entries
  • 10/02/2017
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC20510: Manufacture Deadly Weapon:cane sword; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 001; PC667(b)-(i): W/Pr Fel Conv:Serious/Violent Felony; Denied; Charge Number: 001; PC667.5(b): W/Pr Prison:Othr Than 667.5(A) (ENHANCEMENT); Denied; Charge Number: 001; PC667.5(b): W/Pr Prison:Othr Than 667.5(A) (ENHANCEMENT); Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Martinez, Mathew Joseph; Defendant: Padin, Alexis Omar; Deputy Public Defender: Lope, Armando

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Martinez, Mathew Joseph; Defendant: Padin, Alexis Omar; Deputy Public Defender: Mclean, Todd Eugene

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourtesy Notice - Notice to Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • ChargeCharges: Padin, Alexis Omar; Charge #: 001; Description: PC667.5(b): W/Pr Prison:Othr Than 667.5(A) (ENHANCEMENT); Statute: 667.5(b); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • ChargeCharges: Padin, Alexis Omar; Charge #: 001; Description: PC667.5(b): W/Pr Prison:Othr Than 667.5(A) (ENHANCEMENT); Statute: 667.5(b); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • ChargeCharges: Padin, Alexis Omar; Charge #: 001; Description: PC667(b)-(i): W/Pr Fel Conv:Serious/Violent Felony; Statute: 667(b)-(i); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • ChargeCharges: Padin, Alexis Omar; Charge #: 001; Description: PC20510: Manufacture Deadly Weapon:cane sword; Statute: 20510; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Turner, Leslie Allan

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rosenthal, Sara R

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARTINEZ, MATHEW JOSEPH