This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 03/09/2022 at 18:11:14 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Alejandro Luis Hernandezperez, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 12/29/2021 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Alejandro Luis Hernandezperez, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ash, Carol and Hollman, James. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6310

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ash, Carol

Hollman, James

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Hernandezperez, Alejandro Luis

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Rosenthal, Sara R

Gates, Kathryn

Defendant Attorneys

Carasso, Alexander Louis

Reed, Katharine

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

12/29/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

12/29/2021: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order (Amended)

12/29/2021: Criminal: Minute Order (Amended)

Criminal: Minute Order

01/04/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Bail Bond 555268873-4

01/05/2022: Bail Bond 555268873-4

Criminal: Minute Order

01/18/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

01/31/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

02/07/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Notice of Bail Forfeiture

02/10/2022: Notice of Bail Forfeiture

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketWarrant: Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketBail Bond Forfeiture; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPreliminary Examination; Original Type: Preliminary Examination; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Gates, Kathryn; Defendant; Deputy Public Defender: Reed, Katharine

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPreliminary Examination; Original Type: Preliminary Examination; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Gates, Kathryn; Defendant: HernandezPerez, Alejandro Luis; Deputy Public Defender: Reed, Katharine

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Gates, Kathryn; Defendant: HernandezPerez, Alejandro Luis; Deputy Public Defender: Reed, Katharine

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketBail Bond Booking Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBail Bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC459: Burglary; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 002; PC273.5(a): Inflict Corporal Injury On Spouse/Cohabitant; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 003; PC422(a): Criminal Threats; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketBail Review; Original Type: Bail Review; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Gates, Kathryn; Defendant: HernandezPerez, Alejandro Luis; Deputy Public Defender: Reed, Katharine

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketBail Review Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketOrder: Criminal Protective; Judicial Officer: Hollman, James

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Hollman, James; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Rosenthal, Sara R; Defendant: Hernandezperez, Alejandro Luis; Deputy Public Defender: Carasso, Alexander Louis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • ChargeCharges: HernandezPerez, Alejandro Luis; Charge #: 003; Description: PC422(a): Criminal Threats; Statute: 422(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • ChargeCharges: HernandezPerez, Alejandro Luis; Charge #: 002; Description: PC273.5(a): Inflict Corporal Injury On Spouse/Cohabitant; Statute: 273.5(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • ChargeCharges: HernandezPerez, Alejandro Luis; Charge #: 001; Description: PC459: Burglary; Statute: 459; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Reed, Katharine

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Carasso, Alexander