This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 01/29/2022 at 05:10:15 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Alberto Lopez, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Alberto Lopez, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ash, Carol. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******679B

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ash, Carol

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Lopez, Alberto

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Margain, Andre Carlos

Nored, Thane

Defendant Attorneys

Reed, Katharine

Akbari, Tabasum

 

Court Documents

Bail Bond

09/27/2021: Bail Bond

Complaint

11/24/2021: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

11/29/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

12/06/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

12/20/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

01/10/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Nored, Thane; Defendant: Lopez, Alberto; Contract Public Defender: Akbari, Tabasum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC29800(a)(1): Felon In Possession Of Firearm; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 001; PC186.22(b)(1)(A): Felony Convic Street Gang Activity; Denied; Charge Number: 002; PC30305(a)(1): Person Prohibited In Possession Of Ammunition; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 002; PC186.22(b)(1)(A): Felony Convic Street Gang Activity; Denied; Charge Number: 003; PC25850(a): Carry Loaded Firearm In Public Place; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 004; PC186.22(a): Street Gang Act; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 005; VC2800.1(a): Fleeing Peace Officer; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 006; PC148(a)(1): Obstruct/Resist Public Officer; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Nored, Thane; Defendant: Lopez, Alberto; Contract Public Defender: Akbari, Tabasum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Margain, Andre Carlos; Defendant: Lopez, Alberto; Contract Public Defender: Akbari, Tabasum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Margain, Andre Carlos; Defendant: Lopez, Alberto

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketBail Bond Booking Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBail Bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Lopez, Alberto; Charge #: 006; Description: PC148(a)(1): Obstruct/Resist Public Officer; Statute: 148(a)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Lopez, Alberto; Charge #: 005; Description: VC2800.1(a): Fleeing Peace Officer; Statute: 2800.1(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Lopez, Alberto; Charge #: 004; Description: PC186.22(a): Street Gang Act; Statute: 186.22(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Lopez, Alberto; Charge #: 003; Description: PC25850(a): Carry Loaded Firearm In Public Place; Statute: 25850(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Lopez, Alberto; Charge #: 002; Description: PC186.22(b)(1)(A): Felony Convic Street Gang Activity; Statute: 186.22(b)(1)(A); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Lopez, Alberto; Charge #: 002; Description: PC30305(a)(1): Person Prohibited In Possession Of Ammunition; Statute: 30305(a)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Lopez, Alberto; Charge #: 001; Description: PC186.22(b)(1)(A): Felony Convic Street Gang Activity; Statute: 186.22(b)(1)(A); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Lopez, Alberto; Charge #: 001; Description: PC29800(a)(1): Felon In Possession Of Firearm; Statute: 29800(a)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Reed, Katharine

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Akbari, Tabasum