This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 03/17/2022 at 18:08:53 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Adrian Juarez Reyes, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 01/03/2022 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Adrian Juarez Reyes, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lo, Paul, Hansen, Ronald, Slocum, Steven and Ash, Carol. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0009

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lo, Paul

Hansen, Ronald

Slocum, Steven

Ash, Carol

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Juarezreyes, Adrian

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Min, Thomas Keynes

Silveira, Nicole A.

Rosenthal, Sara R

Serratto, Matthew Travers

Defendant Attorneys

Galeon, Erica Joy

Green, Anthony Charles

Perez, Deborah Najar

Noguera, Michael Anthony

Mclean, Todd Eugene

Coughlin, Michael

Andrade, Vincent

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

01/03/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

01/03/2022: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

01/06/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

01/13/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

01/18/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

01/25/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

02/01/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

02/03/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

02/17/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

02/22/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

02/24/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

03/01/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

03/03/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Motion

03/09/2022: Motion

Criminal: Minute Order

03/11/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Pre-Trial Services Program

03/11/2022: Pre-Trial Services Program

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Services Program

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketRequest; Original Type: Request; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Silveira, Nicole A.; Defendant: Juarezreyes, Adrian; Deputy Public Defender: Perez, Deborah Najar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Silveira, Nicole A.; Defendant: Juarezreyes, Adrian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketProgress Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Min, Thomas Keynes; Defendant: Juarezreyes, Adrian; Deputy Public Defender: Mclean, Todd Eugene

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Min, Thomas Keynes; Defendant: Juarezreyes, Adrian; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Juarezreyes, Adrian; Deputy Public Defender: Noguera, Michael Anthony

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketBail Review; Original Type: Bail Review; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Silveira, Nicole A.; Defendant: Juarezreyes, Adrian; Deputy Public Defender: Galeon, Erica Joy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketBail Review Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC594(a): Vandalism; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 002; PC242: Battery; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketOrder: Criminal Protective; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Serratto, Matthew Travers; Defendant: Juarezreyes, Adrian; Deputy Public Defender: Coughlin, Michael

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Juarezreyes, Adrian; Charge #: 002; Description: PC242: Battery; Statute: 242; Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Juarezreyes, Adrian; Charge #: 001; Description: PC594(a): Vandalism; Statute: 594(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Perez, Deborah Najar

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Noguera, Michael Anthony

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Coughlin, Michael