This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 02/15/2022 at 17:00:51 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Abel Carl Muniz, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 01/18/2022 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Abel Carl Muniz, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Slocum, Steven and Lo, Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0329

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Slocum, Steven

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Muniz, Abel Carl

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Enero, Natalia Ruth

Colacito, Anthony Michael

Defendant Attorneys

Andrade, Vincent

Perez, Deborah Najar

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

01/18/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

01/18/2022: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

01/24/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketPreliminary Examination; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketPretrial Electronic Monitoring Program Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketBail Review; Original Type: Bail Review; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Enero, Natalia Ruth; Defendant: Muniz, Abel Carl; Deputy Public Defender: Perez, Deborah Najar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketBail Review Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC25400(a)(1): Carry Concealed Weapon In Vehicle; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 001; PC186.22(b)(1)(A): Felony Convic Street Gang Activity; Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Colacito, Anthony Michael; Defendant: Muniz, Abel Carl; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Muniz, Abel Carl; Charge #: 001; Description: PC186.22(b)(1)(A): Felony Convic Street Gang Activity; Statute: 186.22(b)(1)(A); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Muniz, Abel Carl; Charge #: 001; Description: PC25400(a)(1): Carry Concealed Weapon In Vehicle; Statute: 25400(a)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Perez, Deborah Najar

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrade, Vincent