This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 05/15/2020 at 15:34:09 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Aaron Delacruz, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 05/29/2015 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Aaron Delacruz, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Breen, Thomas P., Schechter, Jeanne, McNatt, Bobby W., Jacobs, Harry and Hansen, Ronald. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******345B

  • Filing Date:

    05/29/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Breen, Thomas P.

Schechter, Jeanne

McNatt, Bobby W.

Jacobs, Harry

Hansen, Ronald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Delacruz, Aaron Soto

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Drexel, Scott Gregory

Mckinney, Michael C

Serratto, Matthew Travers

Compton, Misty

Martinez, Mathew Joseph

Creeger, Matthew L

Wall, Walter W.

McKinney, Ilia C.

Turner, Leslie Allan

Defendant Attorneys

Herman, George H, III

Coughlin, Michael

Meyer, Derek Scott

Andrade, Vincent

Lyon, Paul J

Pfeiff, Thomas M

Davis, William A

Berger, Richard

 

Court Documents

Complaint

05/29/2015: Complaint

Declaration

05/29/2015: Declaration

Declaration

07/30/2015: Declaration

Felony Advisement of Rights, Waiver and Plea Form

11/17/2015: Felony Advisement of Rights, Waiver and Plea Form

Affidavit of Probation Violation

12/10/2015: Affidavit of Probation Violation

Affidavit of Probation Violation

01/14/2016: Affidavit of Probation Violation

Affidavit of Violation of Mandatory Supervision

05/18/2016: Affidavit of Violation of Mandatory Supervision

Affidavit of Probation Violation

07/12/2016: Affidavit of Probation Violation

Affidavit of Probation Violation

07/20/2016: Affidavit of Probation Violation

Affidavit of Probation Violation

09/20/2016: Affidavit of Probation Violation

Affidavit of Probation Violation

03/14/2017: Affidavit of Probation Violation

Notice

06/05/2017: Notice

Criminal: Minute Order

06/13/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

07/10/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Abstract of Judgment

07/11/2017: Abstract of Judgment

Collection Statement

01/10/2019: Collection Statement

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Collections Statement Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • DocketCourt Collections Order of Referral for Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • FinancialDelacruz, Aaron Soto; Counter Payment; Receipt # CRIM-2018-00134; Delacruz, Aaron Soto; $17.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • FinancialDelacruz, Aaron Soto; Transaction Assessment; $17.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • DocketTranscript

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DispositionPrison; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC186.22(b)(1): Street Gang Act:Conv Felony (ENHANCEMENT); Prison; Adult Confinement; Type: Prison; Facility: California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation; Start Date: 07/10/2017; Consecutive: to Count 1; Term Type: Upper; Term: 4 Years; Comment: Enhancement 1 to count 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DispositionAmended Prison; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC25400(a)(3): Occupant Carry Concealable Weapon In Vehicle (ENHANCEMENT); Prison; Probation; Type: Formal; Start Date: 11/17/2015; Term: 5 Years; End Date: 11/17/2020; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 07/14/2016; Status; Status: Reinstated; Date: 12/08/2016; Status; Status: Terminated; Date: 07/10/2017; Adult Confinement; Type: Prison; Facility: California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation; Start Date: 07/10/2017; Term Type: Upper; Term: 3 Years; Credit for Time Served - Actual: 478 Days; Conduct Credit: 478 Days; Comment: Count 1- Felony; Condition - Adult; Fee Totals; $300.00; Fee Totals; $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry; Charges; Charge Number: 009; VOP#6-PC1203.2(a): Rearrest/Revoke Probation/Etc. (Specify Crime); Found True by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry; Charges; Charge Number: 009; VOP#6-PC1203.2(a): Rearrest/Revoke Probation/Etc. (Specify Crime); Found True

    Read MoreRead Less
109 More Docket Entries
  • 05/29/2015
  • DocketReferred to Probation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Turner, Leslie Allan; Defendant: Delacruz, Aaron Soto; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2015
  • ChargeCharges: Delacruz, Aaron Soto; Charge #: 004; Description: PC25400(c)(3): Gang Member Carrying Concelaed Firearm; Statute: 25400(c)(3); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2015
  • ChargeCharges: Delacruz, Aaron Soto; Charge #: 003; Description: PC186.22(a): Street Gang Act (ENHANCEMENT); Statute: 186.22(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2015
  • ChargeCharges: Delacruz, Aaron Soto; Charge #: 002; Description: PC186.22(b)(1): Street Gang Act:Conv Felony (ENHANCEMENT); Statute: 186.22(b)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2015
  • ChargeCharges: Delacruz, Aaron Soto; Charge #: 002; Description: PC30305(a)(1): Person Prohibited In Possession Of Ammunition; Statute: 30305(a)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2015
  • ChargeCharges: Delacruz, Aaron Soto; Charge #: 001; Description: PC186.22(b)(1): Street Gang Act:Conv Felony (ENHANCEMENT); Statute: 186.22(b)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2015
  • ChargeCharges: Delacruz, Aaron Soto; Charge #: 001; Description: PC25400(a)(3): Occupant Carry Concealable Weapon In Vehicle (ENHANCEMENT); Statute: 25400(a)(3); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mckinney, Michael C

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Turner, Leslie Allan

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Drexel, Scott Gregory