This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 11/17/2021 at 17:03:13 (UTC).

William Snyder, III vs Eunis Hernandez

Case Summary

On 10/20/2021 William Snyder, III filed an Other lawsuit against Eunis Hernandez. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Shaver, Donald and McCabe, Brian. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3449

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Shaver, Donald

McCabe, Brian

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Snyder, William G., III

Respondent

Hernandez, Eunis

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Heil, Austin Brooke

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/20/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders

10/20/2021: Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders

Temporary Restraining Order

10/22/2021: Temporary Restraining Order

Notice of Hearing

10/22/2021: Notice of Hearing

Proof of Service: Law Enforcement Agency

11/08/2021: Proof of Service: Law Enforcement Agency

Non-Criminal: Minute Order

11/15/2021: Non-Criminal: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketOrder Show Cause Re: Restraining Order; Judicial Officer: Shaver, Donald; Hearing Time: 8:45 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Show Cause Re: Restraining Order; Original Type: Order Show Cause Re: Restraining Order; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Petitioner: Snyder, William G., III; Respondent: Hernandez, Eunis; Retained: Heil, Austin Brooke

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service: Law Enforcement Agency

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • FinancialSnyder, William G., III; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2021-04586; Snyder, William G., III; $3.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • FinancialSnyder, William G., III; Transaction Assessment; $3.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketLODGED Order/Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less