This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 04/03/2020 at 17:28:05 (UTC).

Westside Associates, et al vs Cynthia Leanos, et al

Case Summary

On 04/10/2015 Westside Associates filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Cynthia Leanos. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Los Banos Division located in Merced, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Jacobs, Harry. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1060

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judge

Jacobs, Harry

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Westside Associates

Westhill Property Management

Defendant

Leanos, Cynthia

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Vaughn, William A.

 

Court Documents

Writ of Possession

04/27/2015: Writ of Possession

Writ of Possession

04/27/2015: Writ of Possession

Judgment Default by Clerk

04/27/2015: Judgment Default by Clerk

Notice of Entry of Judgment

04/27/2015: Notice of Entry of Judgment

Application

04/27/2015: Application

Request Entry of Default

04/27/2015: Request Entry of Default

Request Entry of Default

04/21/2015: Request Entry of Default

Proof of Service Summons

04/21/2015: Proof of Service Summons

Proof of Service Summons

04/21/2015: Proof of Service Summons

Notice of Filing of Unlawful Detainer and Restricted Access

04/10/2015: Notice of Filing of Unlawful Detainer and Restricted Access

Complaint

04/10/2015: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

04/10/2015: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Filed

04/10/2015: Summons - Filed

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2015
  • FinancialWestside Associates; Counter Payment; Receipt # LB-2015-04560; Vaughn, William A.; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2015
  • FinancialWestside Associates; Transaction Assessment; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2015
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry; Judgment Type: Clerk Judgment; Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Default by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Entry of Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Entry of Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2015
  • FinancialWestside Associates; Counter Payment; Receipt # LB-2015-03649; Vaughn, William A.; $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2015
  • FinancialWestside Associates; Transaction Assessment; $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2015
  • DocketService of Complaint and Summons; Requested By: Westside Associates

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing of Unlawful Detainer and Restricted Access

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2015
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Premise Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Vaughn, William A.