This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 04/10/2020 at 18:56:02 (UTC).

Wesco Insurance Company vs KS Aviation Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/09/2018 Wesco Insurance Company filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against KS Aviation Inc. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Proietti, Donald, McCabe, Brian and Hansen, Ronald. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0929

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Proietti, Donald

McCabe, Brian

Hansen, Ronald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wesco Insurance Company

Defendants

KS Aviation Inc.

Sierra Academy of Aeronautics

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Aires, Timothy Carl

Defendant Attorney

Abbott, Michael L

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Statement

01/28/2020: Case Management Conference Statement

Proof of Service

12/16/2019: Proof of Service

Notice

12/12/2019: Notice

Proof of Service

12/10/2019: Proof of Service

Demurrer

12/10/2019: Demurrer

Request

12/10/2019: Request

Declaration

12/10/2019: Declaration

Notice

11/25/2019: Notice

Declaration

11/22/2019: Declaration

Declaration

11/21/2019: Declaration

Cross Complaint

10/22/2019: Cross Complaint

Non-Criminal: CMC Findings and Order

09/16/2019: Non-Criminal: CMC Findings and Order

Order

09/13/2019: Order

Proof of Service

09/12/2019: Proof of Service

Response

09/12/2019: Response

Proof of Service

09/05/2019: Proof of Service

Case Management Conference Statement

09/05/2019: Case Management Conference Statement

Case Management Conference Statement

09/03/2019: Case Management Conference Statement

70 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketDemurrer; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
74 More Docket Entries
  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPeremptory Challenge 170.6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCross Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • FinancialWesco Insurance Company; EFile Payment; Receipt # WEB-2018-04904; Wesco Insurance Company; $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • FinancialWesco Insurance Company; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Inclusion of CMC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where K.S. Aviation, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AIRES TIMOTHY CARL