This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 12/01/2021 at 07:51:27 (UTC).

Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. vs Ezequiel Alavarez

Case Summary

On 06/28/2019 Wells Fargo Bank, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Ezequiel Alavarez. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Foster, David. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2698

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judge

Foster, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

Defendant

Alavarez, Ezequiel D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brar, Ranjeet K.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

06/28/2019: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

06/28/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons

06/28/2019: Summons

Declaration

06/28/2019: Declaration

Proof of Service Summons

07/10/2019: Proof of Service Summons

Request Entry of Default

11/27/2019: Request Entry of Default

Declaration

11/27/2019: Declaration

Declaration

11/27/2019: Declaration

Declaration

11/27/2019: Declaration

Declaration

11/27/2019: Declaration

Declaration

11/27/2019: Declaration

Judgment Default by Clerk

11/27/2019: Judgment Default by Clerk

Abstract of Judgment

10/29/2021: Abstract of Judgment

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2021
  • FinancialWells Fargo Bank, N.A.; Mail Payment; Receipt # CV-2021-04639; ABC Legal Services, LLC.; $40.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • FinancialWells Fargo Bank, N.A.; Transaction Assessment; $40.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Foster, David; Judgment Type: Clerk Judgment; Party; Names; Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.; Alavarez, Ezequiel D; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To; Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.; Awarded Against; Alavarez, Ezequiel D; Judgment Amount: $8,929.23; Amount; Damages: $8,639.23; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 0.00 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Attorney Fees: $0.00; Costs: $290.00; Total: $8929.23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Default by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Entry of Default

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2019
  • FinancialWells Fargo Bank, N.A.; EFile Payment; Receipt # WEB-2019-15522; Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.; $225.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2019
  • FinancialWells Fargo Bank, N.A.; Transaction Assessment; $225.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRAR RANJEET KAUR