This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 04/03/2020 at 22:44:29 (UTC).

Wainright Family 1, LLC vs. Sergio Chavez, et al

Case Summary

On 05/29/2015 Wainright Family 1, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Sergio Chavez. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Bissig, Louis F. and Kirihara, John. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1535

  • Filing Date:

    05/29/2015

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Bissig, Louis F.

Kirihara, John

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wainright Family 1, LLC

Defendants

Tapia-Madrigal, Olivia

Chavez, Sergio

 

Court Documents

Substitution of Attorney

08/31/2015: Substitution of Attorney

Writ of Possession

07/10/2015: Writ of Possession

Writ of Possession

06/26/2015: Writ of Possession

Stipulated Judgment

06/26/2015: Stipulated Judgment

Unlawful Detainer Judgment Summary Sheet

06/22/2015: Unlawful Detainer Judgment Summary Sheet

Notice of Court Trial

06/10/2015: Notice of Court Trial

Notice of Court Trial

06/10/2015: Notice of Court Trial

Notice of Court Trial

06/10/2015: Notice of Court Trial

Request to Set

06/10/2015: Request to Set

Proof of Service Summons

06/10/2015: Proof of Service Summons

Proof of Service Summons

06/10/2015: Proof of Service Summons

Proof of Service Summons

06/10/2015: Proof of Service Summons

Order on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full

06/08/2015: Order on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full

Proof of Service

06/08/2015: Proof of Service

Answer

06/08/2015: Answer

Order on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full

06/08/2015: Order on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full

Notice of Filing of UD and Restricted Access

06/04/2015: Notice of Filing of UD and Restricted Access

Complaint

05/29/2015: Complaint

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • FinancialWainright Family 1, LLC; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2015-05912; MCES; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • FinancialWainright Family 1, LLC; Transaction Assessment; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2015
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Bissig, Louis F.; Judgment Type: Stipulated Judgment; Party; Names; Wainright Family 1, LLC; Chavez, Sergio; Tapia-Madrigal, Olivia; Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulated Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Judgment Summary Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Trial: Unlawful Detainer; Judicial Officer: Bissig, Louis F.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: Wainright Family 1, LLC; Defendant: Chavez, Sergio; Defendant: Tapia-Madrigal, Olivia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 06/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2015
  • DocketRequest Fee Waiver for Court Fees - Original

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing of Unlawful Detainer and Restricted Access

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • FinancialWainright Family 1, LLC; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2015-04814; Merced County Eviction Service; $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • FinancialWainright Family 1, LLC; Transaction Assessment; $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • DocketService of Complaint and Summons; Requested By: Wainright Family 1, LLC; Served: 06/01/2015; Served: 06/01/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Premise Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    Read MoreRead Less