Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 18:42:16 (UTC).

Victor Drabkin vs. Jim Amado

Case Summary

On 01/23/2015 Victor Drabkin filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Jim Amado. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Bacciarini, Mark, McCabe, Brian and Lo, Paul. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0217

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2015

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Merced County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Old Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Bacciarini, Mark

McCabe, Brian

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Defendant

Amado, Jim T

 

Court Documents

Application and Order for Examination

01/15/2016: Application and Order for Examination

Document Return Form

01/04/2016: Document Return Form

Document Return

01/04/2016: Document Return

Abstract of Judgment

08/13/2015: Abstract of Judgment

Substitution of Attorney

08/07/2015: Substitution of Attorney

Assignment of Judgment

08/07/2015: Assignment of Judgment

Judgment Default by Court

02/19/2015: Judgment Default by Court

Declaration

02/17/2015: Declaration

Request Dismissal

02/17/2015: Request Dismissal

Notice of Filing of Unlawful Detainer and Restrict

02/02/2015: Notice of Filing of Unlawful Detainer and Restrict

Notice of Filing of Unlawful Detainer and Restrict

02/02/2015: Notice of Filing of Unlawful Detainer and Restrict

Notice of Filing of UD and Restricted Access

02/02/2015: Notice of Filing of UD and Restricted Access

Proof of Service Summons

01/30/2015: Proof of Service Summons

Proof of Service Summons

01/30/2015: Proof of Service Summons

Application

01/26/2015: Application

Complaint

01/23/2015: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

01/23/2015: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Filed

01/23/2015: Summons - Filed

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2016
  • DocketOrder of Examination (Non Appeal); Judicial Officer: Bacciarini, Mark; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication and Order for Examination

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocument Return Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAssignment of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2015
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court; Party; Names; Amado, Jim T; Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Default by Court; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Entry of Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing of Unlawful Detainer and Restricted Access

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2015
  • DocketService of Complaint and Summons; Served: 01/26/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2015
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Premise Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    Read MoreRead Less