This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 03/20/2020 at 22:35:27 (UTC).

Unifund CCR, LLC vs Nathanael Ramirez

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 Unifund CCR, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Nathanael Ramirez. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Foster, David. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2100

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judge

Foster, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Unifund CCR, LLC

as assignee of Distressed Asset Portfolio III, LLC, as assignee of Citibank, N.A.

Defendant

Ramirez, Nathanael

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kabir, Rose

 

Court Documents

Complaint

05/17/2019: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

05/17/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons

05/17/2019: Summons

Declaration

05/17/2019: Declaration

Declaration

07/30/2019: Declaration

Proof of Service Summons

10/18/2019: Proof of Service Summons

Answer

12/04/2019: Answer

Order on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full

12/04/2019: Order on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full

Proof of Service

12/04/2019: Proof of Service

Notice of CMC

12/04/2019: Notice of CMC

Notice of CMC

12/04/2019: Notice of CMC

Case Management Conference Statement

03/09/2020: Case Management Conference Statement

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Foster, David; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • FinancialRamirez, Nathanael; Fee Waiver; $225.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • FinancialRamirez, Nathanael; Transaction Assessment; $225.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketRequest Fee Waiver for Court Fees - Original

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • FinancialUnifund CCR, LLC; EFile Payment; Receipt # WEB-2019-11922; Unifund CCR, LLC; $225.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • FinancialUnifund CCR, LLC; Transaction Assessment; $225.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where as assignee of Distressed Asset Portfolio III, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where UNIFUND CCR LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KABIR, ROSE