This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 12/02/2021 at 08:12:46 (UTC).

Unifund Ccr, Llc, vs Gina Romo

Case Summary

On 07/20/2020 Unifund Ccr, Llc, filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Gina Romo. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Foster, David. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2070

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judge

Foster, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Unifund Ccr, Llc,

Defendants

Romo, Gina R

Romo, Gina

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Trinh, Katrina

 

Court Documents

WinnLaw_19-17784_com_eABC.pdf

07/20/2020: WinnLaw_19-17784_com_eABC.pdf

WinnLaw_19-17784_sum_eABC.pdf

07/20/2020: WinnLaw_19-17784_sum_eABC.pdf

WinnLaw_19-17784_ccs_eABC.pdf

07/20/2020: WinnLaw_19-17784_ccs_eABC.pdf

WinnLaw_19-17784_ven_eABC.pdf

07/20/2020: WinnLaw_19-17784_ven_eABC.pdf

Proof of Service Summons

07/29/2020: Proof of Service Summons

Request Entry of Default

01/12/2021: Request Entry of Default

Request Dismissal

01/12/2021: Request Dismissal

Declaration

01/12/2021: Declaration

Declaration

01/12/2021: Declaration

Judgment Default by Court

02/01/2021: Judgment Default by Court

Search Request Completed

05/24/2021: Search Request Completed

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2021
  • FinancialUnifund Ccr, Llc,; Mail Payment; Receipt # CV-2021-01777; Winn Law GLroup, APC; $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • FinancialUnifund Ccr, Llc,; Transaction Assessment; $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSearch Request Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Foster, David; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court; Party; Names; Unifund Ccr, Llc,; Romo, Gina R; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To; Unifund Ccr, Llc,; Awarded Against; Romo, Gina R; Amount; Damages: $1,152.91; Costs: $309.50; Total: $1462.41

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Default by Court; Judicial Officer: Foster, David

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Entry of Default

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • FinancialUnifund Ccr, Llc,; EFile Payment; Receipt # WEB-2020-18683; Unifund Ccr, Llc,; $225.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • FinancialUnifund Ccr, Llc,; Transaction Assessment; $225.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNIFUND CCR LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TRINH KATRINA