This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 12/02/2021 at 08:16:10 (UTC).

Top Finance Company Inc vs Jonathan Montgomery

Case Summary

On 09/15/2020 Top Finance Company Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Jonathan Montgomery. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Foster, David and Bacciarini, Mark. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2635

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Foster, David

Bacciarini, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Top Finance Company Inc

Defendant

Montgomery, Jonathan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Burnstad, Bryant

 

Court Documents

Resurgence_TP087162_com_eABC.pdf

09/15/2020: Resurgence_TP087162_com_eABC.pdf

Resurgence_TP087162_sum_eABC.pdf

09/15/2020: Resurgence_TP087162_sum_eABC.pdf

Resurgence_TP087162_ccs_eABC.pdf

09/15/2020: Resurgence_TP087162_ccs_eABC.pdf

Proof of Service Summons

09/28/2020: Proof of Service Summons

Request Entry of Default

05/19/2021: Request Entry of Default

Request Dismissal

05/19/2021: Request Dismissal

Declaration

05/19/2021: Declaration

Declaration

05/19/2021: Declaration

Declaration

05/19/2021: Declaration

Declaration

05/19/2021: Declaration

Declaration

05/19/2021: Declaration

Judgment Default by Court

06/10/2021: Judgment Default by Court

Memorandum of Costs after Judgment

11/24/2021: Memorandum of Costs after Judgment

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs after Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Foster, David; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court; Party; Names; Top Finance Company Inc; Montgomery, Jonathan; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To; Top Finance Company Inc; Awarded Against; Montgomery, Jonathan; Amount; Damages: $6,014.25; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 10.00 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $3,381.03; Costs: $310.26; Total: $9705.54

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Default by Court; Judicial Officer: Bacciarini, Mark

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummary

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Entry of Default

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • FinancialTop Finance Company Inc; EFile Payment; Receipt # WEB-2020-23537; Top Finance Company Inc; $225.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • FinancialTop Finance Company Inc; Transaction Assessment; $225.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Top Finance Company, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Burnstad, Bryant