This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 04/24/2021 at 11:57:42 (UTC).

Top Finance Company, Inc. vs Anthony Fonseca

Case Summary

On 03/25/2020 Top Finance Company, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Anthony Fonseca. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Foster, David. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1407

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judge

Foster, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Top Finance Company, Inc.

Defendant

Fonseca, Anthony

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Chow, Ronnie

 

Court Documents

Non-Criminal: Minute Order

02/18/2021: Non-Criminal: Minute Order

Judgment Default by Court

02/03/2021: Judgment Default by Court

Declaration

01/20/2021: Declaration

Declaration

01/20/2021: Declaration

Declaration

01/20/2021: Declaration

Declaration

01/20/2021: Declaration

Request Dismissal

01/20/2021: Request Dismissal

Request Clerk Judgment

01/20/2021: Request Clerk Judgment

Case Management Conference Statement

01/20/2021: Case Management Conference Statement

Notice of Hearing

12/07/2020: Notice of Hearing

Non-Criminal: Minute Order

11/19/2020: Non-Criminal: Minute Order

Request Entry of Default

10/28/2020: Request Entry of Default

Proof of Service Summons

10/13/2020: Proof of Service Summons

Notice

10/05/2020: Notice

Non-Criminal: Minute Order (Amended)

10/02/2020: Non-Criminal: Minute Order (Amended)

Non-Criminal: CMC Findings and Order

10/02/2020: Non-Criminal: CMC Findings and Order

Case Management Conference Statement

09/03/2020: Case Management Conference Statement

Notice of Inclusion of CMC

04/30/2020: Notice of Inclusion of CMC

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReview of Case Status; Original Type: Review of Case Status; Judicial Officer: Foster, David; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Foster, David; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court; Party; Names; Top Finance Company, Inc.; Fonseca, Anthony; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To; Top Finance Company, Inc.; Awarded Against; Fonseca, Anthony; Amount; Damages: $7,403.36; Attorney Fees: $400.00; Costs: $418.55; Total: $8221.91

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Default by Court; Judicial Officer: Foster, David

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Court Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Original Type: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Foster, David; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Inclusion of CMC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • FinancialTop Finance Company, Inc.; EFile Payment; Receipt # WEB-2020-11600; Top Finance Company, Inc.; $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • FinancialTop Finance Company, Inc.; Transaction Assessment; $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Top Finance Company, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHOW, RONNIE