This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 03/27/2023 at 09:04:57 (UTC).

Tonya Byers vs O.K. Foods, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/26/2022 Tonya Byers filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against O K Foods, Inc. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judge overseeing this case is McCabe, Brian. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3154

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judge

McCabe, Brian

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Byers, Tonya

Defendant

O.K. Foods, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Helsley, Michael S

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

09/26/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons

09/26/2022: Summons

Complaint

09/26/2022: Complaint

Notice of Inclusion of CMC

10/06/2022: Notice of Inclusion of CMC

Request Dismissal

03/17/2023: Request Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal; Party; Names; Byers, Tonya; O.K. Foods, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Inclusion of CMC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • FinancialByers, Tonya; EFile Payment; Receipt # WEB-2022-25849; Byers, Tonya; $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • FinancialByers, Tonya; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less