Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 04/28/2020 at 14:38:37 (UTC).

Theresa Lynn Morlock, et.al. vs Frank Gasper, et al

Case Summary

On 02/25/1992 Theresa Lynn Morlock filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Frank Gasper. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are McCabe, Brian, Lacy, Edward M., Johnson, Margaret, Verderosa, Michele, Proietti, Donald and Hansen, Ronald. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6522

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/1992

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Merced County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Old Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

McCabe, Brian

Lacy, Edward M.

Johnson, Margaret

Verderosa, Michele

Proietti, Donald

Hansen, Ronald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Morlock, Theresa Lynn

Defendants, Not Yet Classified and Cross Defendants

County of Merced

Ested, Fred

Toyota Motor Corporation

Robinson, Kermit

California Deparment of

State of California

Gasper, Frank

Estep, Fred

California Department of

Armstrong, Robert S.

Merced Irrigation District

Arnold, Robert C.

Withrow, Sidney J.

Boland, Hubert

Olmo, Louis

Robinson, Thelma

Trustees

Spinardi, Edward C.

Morlock, Wilma

5 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Brunn, Charles K.

Trustee Attorney

Spencer, Stuart B., Esquire

 

Court Documents

Order

01/06/2020: Order

Notice of Hearing

11/20/2019: Notice of Hearing

Non-Criminal: Minute Order

11/28/2018: Non-Criminal: Minute Order

Notice

10/24/2018: Notice

Order

06/28/2018: Order

Non-Criminal: Minute Order

06/28/2018: Non-Criminal: Minute Order

Notice of Hearing

05/29/2018: Notice of Hearing

Ninth Account Petition

05/29/2018: Ninth Account Petition

Order

05/31/2017: Order

Non-Criminal: Minute Order

05/31/2017: Non-Criminal: Minute Order

Order

12/04/2015: Order

Notice of Hearing

10/26/2015: Notice of Hearing

Subsequent Petition

10/26/2015: Subsequent Petition

Public Historical Documents

04/09/2015: Public Historical Documents

Public Historical Documents

04/08/2015: Public Historical Documents

Public Historical Documents

04/08/2015: Public Historical Documents

Public Historical Documents

11/12/2014: Public Historical Documents

Public Historical Documents

11/10/2014: Public Historical Documents

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder; Judicial Officer: Verderosa, Michele

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition; Judicial Officer: Johnson, Margaret; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Trustee; Attorney: Spencer, Stuart B., Esquire

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketLODGED Order/Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • FinancialSpinardi, Edward C.; EFile Payment; Receipt # WEB-2019-28504; Spinardi, Edward C.; $465.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • FinancialSpinardi, Edward C.; Transaction Assessment; $465.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubsequent Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder; Judicial Officer: Proietti, Donald

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition; Judicial Officer: Proietti, Donald; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Trustee: Spinardi, Edward C.; Attorney: Spencer, Stuart B., Esquire

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • DocketLODGED Order/Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
141 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/1993
  • DocketCross Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/1992
  • DocketAmendment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/1992
  • DocketAmendment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/1992
  • DocketAmendment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/1992
  • DocketRequest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/1992
  • DocketOrder

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/1992
  • DocketStipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/1992
  • DocketAmendment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/1992
  • DocketCross Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/1992
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less