Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 15:34:59 (UTC).

Steven Rangel vs. Ebony Johnson

Case Summary

On 01/13/2015 Steven Rangel filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Ebony Johnson. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Kirihara, John and Lo, Paul. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0103

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2015

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Merced County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Old Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Kirihara, John

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rangel, Steven

Defendant

Johnson, Ebony

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Knight, Noel

 

Court Documents

Writ of Possession

03/13/2015: Writ of Possession

Certificate of Mailing

03/12/2015: Certificate of Mailing

Certificate of Mailing

03/12/2015: Certificate of Mailing

Certificate of Mailing

03/12/2015: Certificate of Mailing

Writ of Possession

03/04/2015: Writ of Possession

Judgment by Court

03/02/2015: Judgment by Court

Judgment by Court

03/02/2015: Judgment by Court

Document Return Form

02/23/2015: Document Return Form

Document Return Form

02/23/2015: Document Return Form

Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

02/18/2015: Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

Notice of Court Trial

01/22/2015: Notice of Court Trial

Notice of Court Trial

01/22/2015: Notice of Court Trial

Request to Set

01/21/2015: Request to Set

Notice of Filing of Unlawful Detainer and Restrict

01/20/2015: Notice of Filing of Unlawful Detainer and Restrict

Order on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full

01/20/2015: Order on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full

Answer

01/20/2015: Answer

Complaint

01/13/2015: Complaint

Summons - Filed

01/13/2015: Summons - Filed

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2015
  • FinancialRangel, Steven; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2015-01892; AAA; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2015
  • FinancialRangel, Steven; Transaction Assessment; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2015
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Judgment Type: Court Judgment; Party; Names; Rangel, Steven; Johnson, Ebony; Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment by Court; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocument Return Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs (Summary)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 01/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2015
  • DocketRequest Fee Waiver for Court Fees - Original

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2015
  • FinancialRangel, Steven; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2015-00296; AAA; $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2015
  • FinancialRangel, Steven; Transaction Assessment; $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2015
  • DocketService of Complaint and Summons; Requested By: Rangel, Steven

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2015
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Premise Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Knight, Noel