Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 02/08/2021 at 07:37:01 (UTC).

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company vs Rosa Cervantes-Damian

Case Summary

On 09/08/2020 State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Rosa Cervantes-Damian. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Foster, David. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2586

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Merced County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Old Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judge

Foster, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Defendants

Cervantes-Damian, Rosa Maria

Bentacourt, Maria Esperanza

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mahfouz, Richard L

Defendant Attorneys

Messina, Irene C

Farkhondeh, Tara

 

Court Documents

Non-Criminal: CMC Findings and Order

02/05/2021: Non-Criminal: CMC Findings and Order

Case Management Conference Statement

01/19/2021: Case Management Conference Statement

Case Management Conference Statement

01/15/2021: Case Management Conference Statement

Notice

12/28/2020: Notice

Notice

12/07/2020: Notice

Answer

12/07/2020: Answer

Proof of Service Summons

10/20/2020: Proof of Service Summons

Notice of CMC

09/16/2020: Notice of CMC

Summons

09/08/2020: Summons

Civil Case Cover Sheet

09/08/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

09/08/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Foster, David; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Original Type: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Foster, David; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Cervantes-Damian, Rosa Maria; Attorney: Farkhondeh, Tara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • FinancialCervantes-Damian, Rosa Maria; EFile Payment; Receipt # WEB-2020-30383; Cervantes-Damian, Rosa Maria; $520.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • FinancialCervantes-Damian, Rosa Maria; Transaction Assessment; $520.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Inclusion of CMC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • FinancialState Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company; EFile Payment; Receipt # WEB-2020-23124; State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company; $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • FinancialState Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company; Transaction Assessment; $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MAHFOUZ RICHARD L.