This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 04/06/2020 at 23:17:00 (UTC).

Shyree Lovelace vs. Phillip Lovelace, Junior

Case Summary

On 11/02/2017 Shyree Lovelace filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Phillip Lovelace, Junior. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are McCabe, Brian, Shaver, Donald and Seymour, Shelly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2796

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

McCabe, Brian

Shaver, Donald

Seymour, Shelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shyree Lovelace

Defendant

Phillip Lovelace, Junior

 

Court Documents

Non-Criminal: Minute Order

11/21/2019: Non-Criminal: Minute Order

Proof of Service

11/07/2019: Proof of Service

Petition: Amended

11/04/2019: Petition: Amended

Document Return

10/31/2019: Document Return

Notice Court Hearing

10/31/2019: Notice Court Hearing

Ex Parte Declaration

10/31/2019: Ex Parte Declaration

Temporary Restraining Order

10/31/2019: Temporary Restraining Order

Request for DVPA no Children (Existing Case)

10/30/2019: Request for DVPA no Children (Existing Case)

Petition: Amended

10/30/2019: Petition: Amended

Non-Criminal: Minute Order

07/10/2019: Non-Criminal: Minute Order

Temporary Restraining Order

06/20/2019: Temporary Restraining Order

Notice Court Hearing

06/20/2019: Notice Court Hearing

Ex Parte Declaration

06/20/2019: Ex Parte Declaration

Request for DVPA no Children (Existing Case)

06/19/2019: Request for DVPA no Children (Existing Case)

Proof of Service Summons

07/11/2018: Proof of Service Summons

Summons - Filed

11/02/2017: Summons - Filed

Petition

11/02/2017: Petition

Order on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full

11/02/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Domestic Violence Restraining Order; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian; Hearing Time: 8:45 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition: Amended

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice: Document Return

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Court Hearing; Judicial Officer: Shaver, Donald

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Declaration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order; Judicial Officer: Shaver, Donald

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for DVPA no Children (Existing Case)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition: Amended

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice: Document Return

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Domestic Violence Restraining Order; Judicial Officer: Seymour, Shelly; Hearing Time: 8:45 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order; Judicial Officer: Seymour, Shelly

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Court Hearing; Judicial Officer: Seymour, Shelly

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Declaration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for DVPA no Children (Existing Case)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • DocketRequest Fee Waiver for Court Fees - Original

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less