Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 21:45:08 (UTC).

Sharon Inouye vs Mia Mitchell

Case Summary

On 02/02/2015 Sharon Inouye filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Mia Mitchell. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Proietti, Donald. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0419

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2015

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Merced County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Old Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judge

Proietti, Donald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Inouye, Taylor

Defendants

Mitchell, Annabelle G

Mitchell, Michael R, Senior

Mitchell, Mia Jessica

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bell, Jason S

 

Court Documents

Request Dismissal

10/30/2015: Request Dismissal

Case Management Conference Statement

07/10/2015: Case Management Conference Statement

Proof of Service Summons

03/16/2015: Proof of Service Summons

Proof of Service

03/16/2015: Proof of Service

Proof of Service Summons

03/16/2015: Proof of Service Summons

Application

02/13/2015: Application

Notice of Inclusion of CMC

02/11/2015: Notice of Inclusion of CMC

Complaint

02/02/2015: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

02/02/2015: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Filed

02/02/2015: Summons - Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2015
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Proietti, Donald; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Proietti, Donald; Judgment Type: Dismissal; Party; Names; Inouye, Taylor; Mitchell, Mia Jessica; Mitchell, Michael R, Senior; Mitchell, Annabelle G

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Proietti, Donald; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2015
  • DocketService of Complaint and Summons; Served: 03/07/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2015
  • DocketService of Complaint and Summons; Served: 03/07/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2015
  • DocketService of Complaint and Summons; Served: 03/07/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Inclusion of CMC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2015
  • DocketService of Complaint and Summons; Requested By: Inouye, Taylor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BELL, JASON S