Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 04/05/2020 at 21:34:36 (UTC).

Sharon Horne vs. James Horne

Case Summary

On 03/04/2016 Sharon Horne filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against James Horne. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kirihara, John. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0645

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2016

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Merced County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Old Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kirihara, John

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Horne, Sharon L

Defendant

Horne, James R

 

Court Documents

Writ of Possession

04/04/2016: Writ of Possession

Writ of Possession

03/21/2016: Writ of Possession

Judgment Default by Clerk

03/18/2016: Judgment Default by Clerk

Request Entry of Default

03/18/2016: Request Entry of Default

Proof of Service Summons

03/17/2016: Proof of Service Summons

Order on Court Fee Waiver - Denied

03/08/2016: Order on Court Fee Waiver - Denied

Notice of Filing of Unlawful Detainer and Restricted Access

03/04/2016: Notice of Filing of Unlawful Detainer and Restricted Access

Summons - Filed

03/04/2016: Summons - Filed

Complaint

03/04/2016: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

03/04/2016: Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • FinancialHorne, Sharon L; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2016-01780; Horne, Sharon L; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • FinancialHorne, Sharon L; Transaction Assessment; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John; Judgment Type: Clerk Judgment; Party; Names; Horne, Sharon L; Horne, James R; Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Default by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Entry of Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2016
  • FinancialHorne, Sharon L; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2016-01736; Horne, Sharon L; $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2016
  • FinancialHorne, Sharon L; Transaction Assessment; $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2016
  • FinancialHorne, Sharon L; Transaction Assessment; $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2016
  • FinancialHorne, Sharon L; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2016-01735; Horne, Sharon L; $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver - Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • FinancialHorne, Sharon L; Transaction Assessment; $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing of Unlawful Detainer and Restricted Access

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • DocketRequest Fee Waiver for Court Fees - Original

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Premise Address

    Read MoreRead Less