Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 06/04/2021 at 17:00:45 (UTC).

Severino Reedy vs Desmond Harrison

Case Summary

On 05/07/2021 Severino Reedy filed an Other lawsuit against Desmond Harrison. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are McCabe, Brian and Shaver, Donald. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1484

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Merced County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Old Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

McCabe, Brian

Shaver, Donald

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Reedy, Severino Jospeh

Respondent

Harrison, Desmond

 

Court Documents

Order After Hearing

06/03/2021: Order After Hearing

Non-Criminal: Minute Order

06/03/2021: Non-Criminal: Minute Order

Proof of Service: Law Enforcement Agency

05/26/2021: Proof of Service: Law Enforcement Agency

Notice of Hearing

05/11/2021: Notice of Hearing

Temporary Restraining Order

05/11/2021: Temporary Restraining Order

Order

05/11/2021: Order

Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders

05/07/2021: Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders

Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders

05/07/2021: Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders

Civil Case Cover Sheet

05/07/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder After Hearing; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketOrder Show Cause Re: Restraining Order; Judicial Officer: Shaver, Donald; Hearing Time: 8:45 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Show Cause Re: Restraining Order; Original Type: Order Show Cause Re: Restraining Order; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Petitioner: Reedy, Severino Jospeh

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketOrder Show Cause Re: Restraining Order; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service: Law Enforcement Agency

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketLODGED Order/Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less