Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 04/03/2020 at 22:26:08 (UTC).

Santa Nella County Water District vs Santa Nella Plaza, et al

Case Summary

On 05/28/2015 Santa Nella County Water District filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Santa Nella Plaza. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are McCabe, Brian and Proietti, Donald. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1533

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2015

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Merced County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Old Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

McCabe, Brian

Proietti, Donald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Santa Nella County Water District

Defendant

Santa Nella Plaza

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Burns, Allison Elizabeth

Hendricks, Colin A.

 

Court Documents

Abstract of Judgment

09/07/2017: Abstract of Judgment

Declaration

12/07/2016: Declaration

Other Documents Not Listed

12/07/2016: Other Documents Not Listed

Application

12/07/2016: Application

Request Court Judgment

12/07/2016: Request Court Judgment

Request Dismissal

12/07/2016: Request Dismissal

Other Documents Not Listed

11/01/2016: Other Documents Not Listed

Declaration

08/22/2016: Declaration

Request Entry of Default

12/15/2015: Request Entry of Default

Proof of Service Summons

11/12/2015: Proof of Service Summons

Notice

10/06/2015: Notice

Proof of Service Summons

09/04/2015: Proof of Service Summons

Proof of Service Summons

09/03/2015: Proof of Service Summons

Proof of Service Summons

09/03/2015: Proof of Service Summons

Notice

06/05/2015: Notice

Complaint

05/28/2015: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

05/28/2015: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Filed

05/28/2015: Summons - Filed

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2017
  • FinancialSanta Nella County Water District; Government Exemption - GC6103; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • FinancialSanta Nella County Water District; Transaction Assessment; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • FinancialSanta Nella County Water District; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2017-04418; Sacramento Legal Support; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • FinancialSanta Nella County Water District; Transaction Assessment; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • DocketReview of Case Status; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Proietti, Donald; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court; Party; Names; Santa Nella County Water District; Santa Nella Plaza; County of Merced; Judgment - Non-Monetary Award; Awarded To; Santa Nella County Water District; Awarded Against; Santa Nella Plaza

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment; Judicial Officer: Proietti, Donald

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 09/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2015
  • FinancialSanta Nella County Water District; Fee Waiver; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2015
  • FinancialSanta Nella County Water District; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Inclusion of CMC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BURNS ALLISON E.