Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 04/06/2020 at 19:55:50 (UTC).

Russell McGarry, Junior vs. Javier Ramirez, et al

Case Summary

On 07/15/2016 Russell McGarry, Junior filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Javier Ramirez. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Bacciarini, Mark, Jacobs, Harry and McCabe, Brian. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2071

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2016

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Merced County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Old Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Bacciarini, Mark

Jacobs, Harry

McCabe, Brian

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

McGarry, Russell C, Junior

Defendants

Ramirez, Cecilia

Ramirez, Javier

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Morse, Cindy R

 

Court Documents

Writ of Possession

08/15/2016: Writ of Possession

Writ of Possession

08/05/2016: Writ of Possession

Judgment Default by Court

08/04/2016: Judgment Default by Court

Judgment Default by Clerk

08/03/2016: Judgment Default by Clerk

Request Dismissal

08/03/2016: Request Dismissal

Declaration

08/03/2016: Declaration

Request Entry of Default

08/03/2016: Request Entry of Default

Proof of Service Summons

07/19/2016: Proof of Service Summons

Proof of Service Summons

07/19/2016: Proof of Service Summons

Proof of Service Summons

07/19/2016: Proof of Service Summons

Application

07/18/2016: Application

Notice of Filing of Unlawful Detainer and Restricted Access

07/15/2016: Notice of Filing of Unlawful Detainer and Restricted Access

Complaint

07/15/2016: Complaint

Summons

07/15/2016: Summons

Civil Case Cover Sheet

07/15/2016: Civil Case Cover Sheet

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • FinancialMcGarry, Russell C, Junior; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2016-04028; Central Collections LLC; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • FinancialMcGarry, Russell C, Junior; Transaction Assessment; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court; Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Default by Court; Judicial Officer: Bacciarini, Mark

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry; Judgment Type: Clerk Judgment; Party; Names; McGarry, Russell C, Junior; Ramirez, Javier; Ramirez, Cecilia; Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Default by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 07/18/2016
  • FinancialMcGarry, Russell C, Junior; EFile Payment; Receipt # WEB-2016-09444; McGarry, Russell C; $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2016
  • FinancialMcGarry, Russell C, Junior; Transaction Assessment; $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • FinancialMcGarry, Russell C, Junior; EFile Payment; Receipt # WEB-2016-09321; McGarry, Russell C; $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • FinancialMcGarry, Russell C, Junior; Transaction Assessment; $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing of Unlawful Detainer and Restricted Access

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Premise Address

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Morse, Cindy R