Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 02/02/2021 at 11:27:02 (UTC).

Rupindejit Kaur vs Sabrina Martinez

Case Summary

On 03/06/2020 Rupindejit Kaur filed an Other lawsuit against Sabrina Martinez. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are McCabe, Brian, Proietti, Donald and Shaver, Donald. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1075

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Merced County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Old Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

McCabe, Brian

Proietti, Donald

Shaver, Donald

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Kaur, Rupindejit

Respondent

Martinez, Sabrina Maria

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Castleton, Jeffrey C

 

Court Documents

Order After Hearing

10/30/2020: Order After Hearing

Non-Criminal: Minute Order

09/02/2020: Non-Criminal: Minute Order

Non-Criminal: Minute Order

08/04/2020: Non-Criminal: Minute Order

Notice

07/08/2020: Notice

Substitution of Attorney

07/08/2020: Substitution of Attorney

Order

07/07/2020: Order

Request

07/06/2020: Request

Non-Criminal: Minute Order

07/02/2020: Non-Criminal: Minute Order

Notice

06/10/2020: Notice

Order

06/09/2020: Order

Non-Criminal: Minute Order

06/08/2020: Non-Criminal: Minute Order

Non-Criminal: Minute Order

06/01/2020: Non-Criminal: Minute Order

Non-Criminal: Minute Order

03/30/2020: Non-Criminal: Minute Order

Proof of Service

03/20/2020: Proof of Service

Temporary Restraining Order

03/09/2020: Temporary Restraining Order

Notice of Hearing

03/09/2020: Notice of Hearing

Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders

03/06/2020: Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders

Civil Case Cover Sheet

03/06/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder After Hearing; Judicial Officer: Shaver, Donald

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian; Judgment Type: Court Judgment; Party; Names; Kaur, Rupindejit; Martinez, Sabrina Maria

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Show Cause Re: Restraining Order; Original Type: Order Show Cause Re: Restraining Order; Judicial Officer: Shaver, Donald; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Petitioner: Kaur, Rupindejit; Attorney: Castleton, Jeffrey C; Respondent: Martinez, Sabrina Maria

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketOrder Show Cause Re: Restraining Order; Judicial Officer: Proietti, Donald; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Show Cause Re: Restraining Order; Original Type: Order Show Cause Re: Restraining Order; Judicial Officer: Proietti, Donald; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Respondent: Martinez, Sabrina Maria

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Continue Court Hearing and Reissue TRO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Show Cause Re: Restraining Order; Original Type: Order Show Cause Re: Restraining Order; Judicial Officer: Proietti, Donald; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Respondent: Martinez, Sabrina Maria

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Continue Court Hearing and Reissue TRO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Show Cause Re: Restraining Order; Original Type: Order Show Cause Re: Restraining Order; Judicial Officer: Proietti, Donald; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Show Cause Re: Restraining Order; Original Type: Order Show Cause Re: Restraining Order; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Petitioner; Attorney: Castleton, Jeffrey C; Respondent: Martinez, Sabrina Maria

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Show Cause Re: Restraining Order; Original Type: Order Show Cause Re: Restraining Order; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Petitioner; Attorney: Castleton, Jeffrey C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Judicial Officer: McCabe, Brian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketLODGED Order/Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Castleton, Jeffrey C