This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 04/09/2020 at 19:29:07 (UTC).

Rosa Maldonado, Petitioner vs. Rafael Maldonado Montellano, Respondent

Case Summary

On 12/11/2018 Rosa Maldonado, Petitioner filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Rafael Maldonado Montellano, Respondent. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Bovenkerk, Matt, Castleton, Aaron, Shaver, Donald and Seymour, Shelly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3171

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Bovenkerk, Matt

Castleton, Aaron

Shaver, Donald

Seymour, Shelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rosa Maldonado, Petitioner

Defendant

Rafael Maldonado Montellano, Respondent

 

Court Documents

Finding and Order After Hearing

11/14/2019: Finding and Order After Hearing

Non-Criminal: Minute Order

11/13/2019: Non-Criminal: Minute Order

Proof of Service by Mail

11/04/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Responsive Declaration

11/01/2019: Responsive Declaration

Child Custody Recommending Counseling -Recommendation

10/24/2019: Child Custody Recommending Counseling -Recommendation

Non-Criminal: Minute Order

10/24/2019: Non-Criminal: Minute Order

Non-Criminal: Minute Order

10/07/2019: Non-Criminal: Minute Order

Proof of Service

09/04/2019: Proof of Service

Request for Order:Modification

07/30/2019: Request for Order:Modification

Request Entry of Default

01/18/2019: Request Entry of Default

Declaration: Default/Uncontested Disso

01/18/2019: Declaration: Default/Uncontested Disso

Judgment Checklist

01/18/2019: Judgment Checklist

Declaration

01/18/2019: Declaration

Proof of Service Summons

01/03/2019: Proof of Service Summons

Order on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full

12/11/2018: Order on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full

Declaration Under UCCJEA

12/11/2018: Declaration Under UCCJEA

Summons - Filed

12/11/2018: Summons - Filed

Petition

12/11/2018: Petition

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinding and Order After Hearing; Judicial Officer: Seymour, Shelly

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFurther Proceedings; Judicial Officer: Seymour, Shelly; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponsive Declaration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketChild Custody Recommending Counseling -Recommendation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketChild Custody Recommending Counseling; Judicial Officer: Bovenkerk, Matt; Hearing Time: 8:45 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order: Modification; Judicial Officer: Seymour, Shelly; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order:Modification

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Under UCCJEA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Entry of Default

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration: Default/Uncontested Disso

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Checklist

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketRequest Fee Waiver for Court Fees - Original

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Under UCCJEA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less