Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 03/29/2021 at 17:00:45 (UTC).

Robert Womack vs. Leticia Solis

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 Robert Womack filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Leticia Solis. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Seymour, Shelly and Martinez, Maria. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0373

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Merced County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Seymour, Shelly

Martinez, Maria

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robert Womack

Defendant

Leticia Solis

 

Court Documents

Finding and Order After Hearing

03/19/2021: Finding and Order After Hearing

CCRC Agreement

03/18/2021: CCRC Agreement

Non-Criminal: Minute Order

03/18/2021: Non-Criminal: Minute Order

Non-Criminal: Minute Order

03/10/2021: Non-Criminal: Minute Order

Proof of Service: Law Enforcement Agency

03/08/2021: Proof of Service: Law Enforcement Agency

Temporary Emergency (Ex Parte) Orders: DENIED

03/03/2021: Temporary Emergency (Ex Parte) Orders: DENIED

Ex Parte Declaration

03/03/2021: Ex Parte Declaration

Request for Order:Initial

03/03/2021: Request for Order:Initial

Declaration Under UCCJEA

03/01/2021: Declaration Under UCCJEA

Income and Expense Declaration

03/01/2021: Income and Expense Declaration

Order on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full

03/01/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full

Declaration Under UCCJEA

03/01/2021: Declaration Under UCCJEA

Summons - Filed

03/01/2021: Summons - Filed

Petition

03/01/2021: Petition

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketFurther Proceedings; Judicial Officer: Seymour, Shelly; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinding and Order After Hearing; Judicial Officer: Seymour, Shelly

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCCRC Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketChild Custody Recommending Counseling; Original Type: Child Custody Recommending Counseling; Judicial Officer: Martinez, Maria; Hearing Time: 8:45 AM; Result: CCRC Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order: Initial; Original Type: Request for Order: Initial; Judicial Officer: Seymour, Shelly; Hearing Time: 8:45 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service: Law Enforcement Agency

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTemporary Emergency (Ex Parte) Orders: DENIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order:Initial; Judicial Officer: Seymour, Shelly

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketIncome and Expense Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver Granted - Full; Judicial Officer: Seymour, Shelly

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketRequest Fee Waiver for Court Fees - Original

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Under UCCJEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition

    Read MoreRead Less