This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 04/07/2020 at 23:16:40 (UTC).

Robert Calloway vs Russell McGarry, et al.

Case Summary

On 01/11/2017 Robert Calloway filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Russell McGarry. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Bacciarini, Mark. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0081

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judge

Bacciarini, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Calloway, Robert

Defendants

McGarry, Russell

Venable, David

 

Court Documents

Claim - Plaintiff

01/11/2017: Claim - Plaintiff

Declaration

01/11/2017: Declaration

Subpoena

01/11/2017: Subpoena

Subpoena

01/11/2017: Subpoena

Subpoena

01/11/2017: Subpoena

Request

01/19/2017: Request

Order

01/23/2017: Order

Certificate of Mailing

01/23/2017: Certificate of Mailing

Certificate of Mailing

01/23/2017: Certificate of Mailing

Notice of Entry of Judgment

03/01/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment

Certificate of Mailing

03/01/2017: Certificate of Mailing

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Bacciarini, Mark; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court; Party; Names; Calloway, Robert; McGarry, Russell; Venable, David; Judgment - Non-Monetary Award; Awarded To; McGarry, Russell; Venable, David; Awarded Against; Calloway, Robert; Comment: Defendant's do not owe any money on Plaintiff's claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • DocketCourt Trial; Judicial Officer: Bacciarini, Mark; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: McGarry, Russell

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder; Judicial Officer: Bacciarini, Mark

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • FinancialMcGarry, Russell; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2017-00273; McGarry, Russell; $1.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • FinancialMcGarry, Russell; Transaction Assessment; $1.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • FinancialMcGarry, Russell; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2017-00271; McGarry, Russell; $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • FinancialMcGarry, Russell; Transaction Assessment; $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • FinancialCalloway, Robert; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2017-00153; Calloway, Robert; $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • FinancialCalloway, Robert; Transaction Assessment; $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubpoena

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubpoena

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubpoena

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim - Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less