Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 04/05/2020 at 21:51:56 (UTC).

Rental Management Inc. vs. Nessertina Wilson

Case Summary

On 03/08/2016 Rental Management Inc filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Nessertina Wilson. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kirihara, John. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0691

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2016

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Merced County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Old Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kirihara, John

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rental Management Inc.

Defendant

Wilson, Nessertina K

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Newman, William A

 

Court Documents

Judgment Default by Court

04/05/2016: Judgment Default by Court

Affidavit

03/30/2016: Affidavit

Writ of Possession

03/30/2016: Writ of Possession

Judgment Default by Clerk

03/30/2016: Judgment Default by Clerk

Request Dismissal

03/30/2016: Request Dismissal

Proof of Service Summons

03/30/2016: Proof of Service Summons

Proof of Service Summons

03/30/2016: Proof of Service Summons

Request Entry of Default

03/30/2016: Request Entry of Default

Order

03/14/2016: Order

Request

03/14/2016: Request

Notice of Filing of Unlawful Detainer and Restricted Access

03/09/2016: Notice of Filing of Unlawful Detainer and Restricted Access

Summons

03/08/2016: Summons

Complaint

03/08/2016: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

03/08/2016: Civil Case Cover Sheet

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2016
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court; Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Default by Court; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John; Judgment Type: Clerk Judgment; Party; Names; Rental Management Inc.; Wilson, Nessertina K; Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • FinancialRental Management Inc.; EFile Payment; Receipt # WEB-2016-03687; Rental Management Inc.; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • FinancialRental Management Inc.; Transaction Assessment; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Default by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/14/2016
  • FinancialRental Management Inc.; Transaction Assessment; $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • FinancialRental Management Inc.; EFile Payment; Receipt # WEB-2016-02841; Rental Management Inc.; $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • FinancialRental Management Inc.; Transaction Assessment; $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing of Unlawful Detainer and Restricted Access

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Premise Address

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Rental Management Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Newman, William A