Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 04/04/2020 at 15:43:25 (UTC).

Rental Management Inc vs. Dashawn Calhoun

Case Summary

On 08/20/2015 Rental Management Inc filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Dashawn Calhoun. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Old Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kirihara, John. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2401

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2015

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Merced County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Old Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kirihara, John

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rental Management Inc

Defendant

Calhoun, Dashawn

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Newman, William A

 

Court Documents

Writ of Possession

09/16/2015: Writ of Possession

Judgment Default by Court

09/04/2015: Judgment Default by Court

Affidavit

09/01/2015: Affidavit

Writ of Possession

09/01/2015: Writ of Possession

Judgment Default by Clerk

09/01/2015: Judgment Default by Clerk

Request Dismissal

09/01/2015: Request Dismissal

Request Entry of Default

09/01/2015: Request Entry of Default

Request Entry of Default

08/26/2015: Request Entry of Default

Proof of Service Summons

08/26/2015: Proof of Service Summons

Proof of Service Summons

08/26/2015: Proof of Service Summons

Notice of Filing of Unlawful Detainer and Restrict

08/24/2015: Notice of Filing of Unlawful Detainer and Restrict

Notice of Filing of Unlawful Detainer and Restrict

08/24/2015: Notice of Filing of Unlawful Detainer and Restrict

Notice of Filing of UD and Restricted Access

08/24/2015: Notice of Filing of UD and Restricted Access

Complaint

08/20/2015: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

08/20/2015: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Filed

08/20/2015: Summons - Filed

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court; Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Default by Court; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2015
  • FinancialRental Management Inc; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2015-08174; Legal Support Net, Inc.; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2015
  • FinancialRental Management Inc; Transaction Assessment; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2015
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John; Judgment Type: Clerk Judgment; Party; Names; Rental Management Inc; Calhoun, Dashawn; Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Default by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 08/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing of Unlawful Detainer and Restricted Access

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • FinancialRental Management Inc; Counter Payment; Receipt # CV-2015-07780; Legal Support Net, Inc; $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • FinancialRental Management Inc; Transaction Assessment; $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • DocketService of Complaint and Summons; Requested By: Rental Management Inc; Served: 08/20/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Premise Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons - Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Rental Management Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Newman, William A